Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Thomas Kohler (until 2008-06-30) | 1967-06-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Eduard Geyer (until 2004-11-23) | 1944-10-07 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Petrik Sander (until 2004-11-23) | 1960-11-17 | ||||
Hagen Reeck (until 2004-06-30) | 1959-09-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Andre Thoms (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-12-15 | |||
12 | Gunnar Berntsen (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-10-30 | |||
23 | Tomislav Piplica (until 2009-06-30) | 1969-04-05 | |||
27 | Georg Koch (from 2003-08-27) (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-02-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Ronny Nikol (until 2005-02-15) | 1974-07-11 | |||
3 | Christian Beeck (until 2005-06-30) | 1971-12-18 | |||
4 | Rayk Schroder (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-12-25 | |||
5 | Gregg Berhalter (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-08-01 | |||
6 | Vragel da Silva (until 2010-06-30) | 1974-03-29 | |||
19 | Benjamin Schockel (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-08-16 | |||
25 | Faruk Hujdurovic (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-05-14 | |||
29 | Sebastian Nuhs (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-09-23 | |||
31 | Patrick Jahn (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-02-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Laurentiu Reghecampf (until 2005-01-06) | 1975-09-19 | |||
8 | Adebowale Ogungbure (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-07-13 | |||
11 | Timo Rost (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-08-29 | |||
13 | Zsolt Low (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-04-29 | |||
14 | Marco Gebhardt (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-10-07 | |||
15 | Lars Jungnickel (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-08-31 | |||
16 | Moussa Latoundji (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-08-13 | |||
17 | Markus Anfang (from 2004-01-29) (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-06-12 | |||
18 | Bjorn Brunnemann (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-08-06 | |||
21 | Tomasz Bandrowski (from 2003-09-01) (until 2007-12-31) | 1984-09-18 | |||
30 | Stefan Wollermann (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-06-18 | |||
32 | Tom Schikora (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-03-05 | |||
33 | Ronny Thielemann (until 2003-08-30) | 1973-11-15 | |||
34 | Torsten Mattuschka (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-10-04 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Santiago Silva (from 2003-07-28) (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-12-09 | |||
10 | Robert Vagner (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-05-12 | |||
20 | Adrian Iordache (from 2003-07-28) (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-11-13 | |||
22 | Jiri Kaufman (from 2003-08-10) (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-11-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2003-08-29 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |