Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Andreas Bergmann (from 2004-03-29) (until 2006-11-20) | 1959-06-18 | ||||
Franz Gerber (until 2004-03-28) | 1953-11-27 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dirk Zander (until 2004-06-30) | 1965-05-13 | ||||
Harald Gartner (until 2004-03-28) | 1968-11-30 | ||||
Markus Lotter (until 2003-07-30) | 1970-09-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Achim Hollerieth (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-09-24 | |||
20 | Frank Droge (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-05-08 | |||
30 | Torsten Miethe (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-06-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Hempen (from 2004-06-01) (until 2006-09-30) | 1974-08-30 | ||||
2 | Cory Gibbs (until 2004-02-03) | 1980-01-14 | |||
3 | Nascimento (until 2004-01-26) | 1980-03-14 | |||
4 | Fabio Morena (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-03-19 | |||
6 | Jens Matthies (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-06-29 | |||
21 | Holger Stanislawski (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-09-26 | |||
24 | Marco Gruszka (from 2003-08-25) (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-12-06 | |||
26 | Ralph Gunesch (from 2003-09-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-09-02 | |||
33 | Robert Palikuca (from 2004-02-03) (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-05-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Hauke Bruckner (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-02-29 | |||
7 | Andreas Mayer (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-09-13 | |||
8 | Daniel Sager (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-06-10 | |||
13 | Patrick Molzl (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-12-28 | |||
14 | Willem Hupkes (from 2003-09-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-10-19 | |||
16 | Heiko Ansorge (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-04-18 | |||
17 | Fabian Boll (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-06-16 | |||
18 | Mathias Hinzmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-01-02 | |||
22 | Mourad Bounoua (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-07-30 | |||
23 | Wojciech Bobrowski (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-12-20 | |||
25 | Marinko Miletic (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-10-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Rico Hanke (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-08-04 | |||
10 | Cosmin Uilacan (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-11-05 | |||
11 | Philip Albrecht (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-11-21 | |||
12 | Henry Nwosu (from 2003-10-17) (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-02-14 | |||
15 | Festus Agu (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-03-13 | |||
19 | Audenzio Musci (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-03-09 | |||
27 | Bertrand Bingana (until 2004-06-30) | 1985-01-02 | |||
28 | Yusuf Akbel (from 2004-04-01) (until 2005-08-03) | 1984-07-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2003-09-01 18:00 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2003-10-28 19:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |