Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jorg Sievers (until 2014-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ewald Lienen (from 2004-03-09) (until 2005-11-09) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Ralf Rangnick (until 2004-03-07) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Frontzeck (from 2004-03-09) (until 2005-11-09) | 1964-03-26 | ||||
Mirko Slomka (until 2004-06-30) | 1967-09-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Gerhard Tremmel (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-11-16 | |||
25 | Marc Ziegler (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-06-13 | |||
30 | Daniel Haas (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-08-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Dariusz Zuraw (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-11-14 | |||
4 | Dame Diouf (until 2004-01-26) | 1978-03-31 | |||
6 | Steven Cherundolo (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-02-19 | |||
14 | Abel Xavier (from 2004-02-02) (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-11-30 | |||
15 | Thomas Schneider (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-11-24 | |||
16 | Markus Schuler (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-08-01 | |||
21 | Kleber (from 2003-09-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-04-01 | |||
24 | Kostas Konstantinidis (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-08-31 | |||
29 | Per Mertesacker (until 2006-08-07) | 1984-09-29 | |||
40 | Vinicius (until 2009-04-30) | 1980-07-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Wladimir But (from 2004-02-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-09-07 | |||
5 | Christoph Dabrowski (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-07-01 | |||
8 | Altin Lala (until 2012-06-30) | 1975-11-18 | |||
17 | Nebojsa Krupnikovic (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-08-15 | |||
18 | Danijel Stefulj (until 2004-02-01) | 1973-06-02 | |||
19 | Jaime (from 2004-01-29) (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-03-20 | |||
20 | Jan Simak (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-10-13 | |||
22 | Julian de Guzman (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-03-25 | |||
27 | Silvio Schroter (until 2008-01-23) | 1979-06-29 | |||
34 | Nils Pfingsten-Reddig (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-05-23 | |||
35 | Bjorn Lindemann (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-01-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Mohamadou Idrissou (until 2005-01-31) | 1980-03-08 | |||
9 | Thomas Christiansen (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-03-11 | |||
10 | Jiri Stajner (until 2004-02-01) | 1976-05-27 | |||
11 | Daniel Stendel (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-04-04 | |||
13 | Thomas Brdaric (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-01-23 | |||
14 | Jiri Kaufman (until 2003-08-09) | 1979-11-28 | |||
19 | Babacar N'Diaye (until 2003-08-04) | 1973-12-12 | |||
23 | Stanko Svitlica (from 2004-02-02) (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-05-24 | |||
26 | Fabian Montabell (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-02-13 | |||
32 | Denis Wolf (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-01-15 | |||
36 | Aleksandar Kotuljac (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-11-02 | |||
38 | Salim Djefaflia (until 2004-08-10) | 1978-10-09 | |||
44 | Clint Mathis (from 2004-01-20) (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-11-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2003-08-31 15:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2003-10-29 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |