Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Michael Feichtenbeiner (until 2004-04-10) | 1960-07-09 | ||||
Gerhard Noll (until 2004-04-10) | 1955-06-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gerhard Noll (from 2004-04-11) (until 2006-02-04) | 1955-06-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
12 | Sven Eckhardt (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-01-22 | |||
22 | Andreas Koch (until 2005-06-30) | 1971-07-13 | |||
30 | Manuel Wolff (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-09-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Bjorn Weikl (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-02-09 | |||
3 | Matthias Straub (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-11-24 | |||
4 | Rafael Mea Vitali (from 2004-01-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-02-16 | |||
5 | Marco Stark (from 2004-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-07-09 | |||
15 | Eric Lukin (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-06-14 | |||
16 | Cem Islamoglu (until 2005-08-15) | 1980-09-04 | |||
19 | Oliver Unsold (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-10-21 | |||
20 | Tobias Zott (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-08-12 | |||
21 | Tobias Wurm (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-03-31 | |||
27 | Francisco Lima Fernando (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-06-04 | |||
32 | Alexander Ecker (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-01-23 | |||
35 | Sascha Backer (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-08-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Patrick Neumann (until 2006-01-19) | 1980-12-02 | |||
7 | Jozef Kotula (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-09-25 | |||
8 | Jens Truckenbrod (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-02-18 | |||
9 | Tomas Daumantas (from 2004-01-31) (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-08-30 | |||
9 | Marco Maser (until 2004-01-20) | 1979-11-07 | |||
10 | Peter Nemeth (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-09-14 | |||
13 | Christian Mehr (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-04-28 | |||
18 | Andreas Nauroth (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-02-26 | |||
41 | Fejz Hodaj (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-11-27 | |||
42 | Steffen Schmitt (from 2004-01-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-03-01 | |||
44 | Marco Weisshaupt (from 2004-01-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-06-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
4 | Joshua Caleb Norkus (until 2003-12-31) | 1979-03-14 | |||
11 | Timo Schlabach (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-12-05 | |||
14 | John van Buskirk (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-04-13 | |||
17 | Till Bettenstaedt (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-01-20 | |||
24 | Tobias Scholer (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-10-03 | |||
25 | Lars Toborg (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-08-19 | |||
33 | Patrick Helmes (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-03-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2003-08-31 15:00 |
2 : 0 rat. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2003-10-29 19:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |