Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Eberhard Trautner (until 2011-06-30) | 1967-02-07 | ||||
Jochen Rucker (until 2005-06-30) | 1944-12-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Felix Magath (until 2004-06-30) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Krassimir Balakow (until 2005-06-30) | 1966-03-29 | ||||
Seppo Eichkorn (until 2004-06-30) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Timo Hildebrand (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-04-05 | |||
23 | Dirk Heinen (until 2007-06-30) | 1970-12-03 | |||
31 | Diego Benaglio (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-09-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Andreas Hinkel (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-03-26 | |||
3 | Boris Zivkovic (from 2004-01-14) (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-11-15 | |||
3 | Timo Wenzel (until 2004-01-07) | 1977-11-30 | |||
4 | Rui Rui Marques (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-09-03 | |||
5 | Bordon (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-01-07 | |||
6 | Fernando Meira (until 2008-07-21) | 1978-06-05 | |||
21 | Philipp Lahm (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-11-11 | |||
24 | Michael Rundio (until 2004-01-24) | 1983-01-21 | |||
29 | Steffen Dangelmayr (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-09-09 | |||
33 | Markus Husterer (from 2003-08-29) (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-06-16 | |||
35 | Serge Branco (from 2003-08-31) (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-10-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Silvio Meissner (until 2006-12-20) | 1973-01-19 | |||
8 | Jurica Vranjes (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-01-30 | |||
11 | Hakan Yakin (from 2004-01-01) (until 2005-01-25) | 1977-02-22 | |||
12 | Heiko Gerber (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-07-11 | |||
13 | Christian Tiffert (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-02-18 | |||
14 | Emanuel Centurion (until 2004-12-31) | 1982-08-25 | |||
15 | Alexander Hleb (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-05-01 | |||
16 | Horst Heldt (until 2005-12-31) | 1969-12-09 | |||
20 | Zvonimir Soldo (until 2006-06-30) | 1967-11-02 | |||
25 | Michael Mutzel (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-09-27 | |||
30 | Denis Berger (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-04-14 | |||
37 | Iwan Stojanow (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-07-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Marco Streller (from 2004-01-13) (until 2006-01-10) | 1981-06-18 | |||
11 | Ioannis Amanatidis (until 2004-01-19) | 1981-12-03 | |||
18 | Cacau (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-03-27 | |||
19 | Imre Szabics (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-03-22 | |||
22 | Kevin Kuranyi (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-03-02 | |||
45 | Mario Gomez (from 2004-03-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1985-07-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2003-08-30 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2003-10-28 19:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2003-12-02 20:30 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |