Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jorg Hossbach (until 2007-08-06) | 1964-11-13 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Eric Gerets (from 2004-04-04) (until 2005-05-29) | 1954-05-18 | ||||
Jurgen Rober (until 2004-04-03) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Frank Greiner (until 2006-06-30) | 1966-07-03 | ||||
Reinhard Stumpf (from 2004-04-04) (until 2005-06-30) | 1961-11-26 | ||||
Bernd Storck (until 2004-04-04) | 1963-01-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Claus Reitmaier (until 2003-08-31) | 1964-03-17 | |||
12 | Sead Ramovic (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-03-14 | |||
29 | Simon Jentzsch (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-05-04 | |||
40 | Patrick Platins (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-04-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Pablo Quattrocchi (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-01-19 | |||
3 | Waldo Ponce (from 2003-08-19) (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-12-04 | |||
4 | Kim Madsen (until 2003-12-18) | 1978-02-13 | |||
5 | Stefan Schnoor (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-04-18 | |||
13 | Marino Biliskov (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-03-17 | |||
19 | Thomas Rytter (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-01-06 | |||
23 | Nenad Lalatovic (from 2004-02-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-12-22 | |||
31 | Hans Sarpei (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-06-28 | |||
33 | Maik Franz (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-08-05 | |||
37 | Karsten Fischer (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-05-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Pablo Thiam (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-01-03 | |||
7 | Patrick Weiser (until 2005-08-28) | 1971-12-25 | |||
8 | Dorinel Munteanu (until 2004-01-25) | 1968-06-25 | |||
10 | Andres D'Alessandro (until 2006-01-31) | 1981-04-15 | |||
18 | Albert Streit (until 2004-01-09) | 1980-03-28 | |||
20 | Mirko Hrgovic (until 2005-12-31) | 1979-02-05 | |||
21 | Martin Petrow (until 2005-07-24) | 1979-01-15 | |||
23 | Sven Muller (until 2004-01-09) | 1980-04-04 | |||
24 | Charles Akonnor (until 2004-01-18) | 1974-03-12 | |||
27 | Miroslav Karhan (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-06-21 | |||
30 | Nderim Nedzipi (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-05-22 | |||
41 | Cedric Makiadi (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-02-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Diego Klimowicz (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-07-06 | |||
11 | Tomislav Maric (until 2004-01-29) | 1973-01-28 | |||
14 | Marko Topic (until 2005-08-31) | 1976-01-01 | |||
17 | Fernando Baiano (from 2003-08-30) (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-03-18 | |||
22 | Roy Prager (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-09-22 | |||
32 | Michal Janicki (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-09-29 | |||
36 | Juan Menseguez (from 2003-08-15) (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-02-18 | |||
39 | Christian Ritter (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-08-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2003-08-30 15:30 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2003-10-28 19:30 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |