Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christoph John (until 2007-06-30) | 1958-12-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Thomas Kessler (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-01-20 | ||||
Lars Leese (until 2005-06-30) | 1969-08-18 | ||||
Andre Maczkowiak (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-04-01 | ||||
Stefan Wessels (from 2005-03-01) (until 2005-04-21) | 1979-02-28 | ||||
Alexander Bade (from 2004-08-01) (until 2004-08-31) | 1970-08-25 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Kevin Schoneberg (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-08-24 | ||||
Sebastian Zinke (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-02-20 | ||||
Tobias Nickenig (until 2007-01-29) | 1984-08-01 | ||||
Roland Benschneider (from 2004-08-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-08-22 | ||||
Alaattin Tosun (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-11-10 | ||||
Timo Achenbach (until 2005-08-01) | 1982-09-03 | ||||
Christian Lell (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-08-29 | ||||
Dennis Polak (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-01-24 | ||||
Daniel Brode (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-02-23 | ||||
Fofo Bolonga (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-05-05 | ||||
Kostas Konstantinidis (from 2004-09-04) (until 2004-09-05) | 1972-08-31 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Enis Alushi (until 2007-01-29) | 1985-12-22 | ||||
Christian Schlosser (until 2006-12-31) | 1985-07-15 | ||||
Sebastian Schindzielorz (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-01-21 | ||||
Markus Feulner (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-02-12 | ||||
Mark Zeh (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-11-19 | ||||
Gerard Sambou (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-10-29 | ||||
Denis Epstein (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-07-02 | ||||
Adil Chihi (until 2006-06-30) | 1988-02-21 | ||||
Jurgen Heinrichs (until 2005-12-31) | 1977-01-21 | ||||
Giovanni Federico (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-10-04 | ||||
Ferhat Kiskanc (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-08-01 | ||||
Michael Lejan (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-05-02 | ||||
Michael Niedrig (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-01-12 | ||||
Rajabu Muller (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-04-21 | ||||
Andrew Sinkala (until 2004-08-31) | 1979-06-18 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Marius Laux (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-02-07 | ||||
Daniel Chitsulo (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-03-07 | ||||
Silvio Pagano (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-09-12 | ||||
Rolf-Christel Guie-Mien (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-10-28 | ||||
Robert Ciolek (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-04-25 | ||||
Thomas Broker (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-01-22 | ||||
Marius Ebbers (from 2004-08-24) (until 2004-09-16) | 1978-01-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2004-08-22 15:00 |
2 : 0 rat. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2004-09-21 19:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |