Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Heinz Bohmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1962-06-14 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Horst Ehrmantraut (until 2005-08-23) | 1955-12-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Didier Philippe (until 2006-05-03) | 1961-09-28 | ||||
Rainer Derber (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-02-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Harald Ebertz (from 2005-02-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1967-05-18 | ||||
1 | Erol Sabanov (until 2004-11-15) | 1974-05-16 | |||
12 | Peter Eich (until 2007-06-30) | 1963-06-18 | |||
13 | Tobias Rott (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-01-29 | |||
15 | Christian Stuff (until 2005-12-20) | 1982-08-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Vinh Long Willemin (until 2005-08-31) | 1982-01-08 | |||
4 | Soren Holz (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-12-10 | |||
5 | Marcel Rozgonyi (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-01-28 | |||
14 | Adiele Echendu (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-11-17 | |||
16 | Stephan Kling (from 2005-01-05) (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-03-22 | |||
18 | Henri Heeren (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-10-25 | |||
21 | Aimen Demai (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-12-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Alessandro Caruso (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-07-04 | |||
6 | Torsten Reuter (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-09-15 | |||
7 | Matthias Hagner (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-08-15 | |||
8 | Thorsten Nehrbauer (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-01-12 | |||
10 | Faysal El-Idrissi (until 2005-12-31) | 1977-11-16 | |||
15 | Tamandani Nsaliwa (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-01-28 | |||
20 | Marco Laping (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-02-14 | |||
22 | Sanel Nuhic (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-06-04 | |||
30 | Michael Oelkuch (until 2004-11-15) | 1973-02-05 | |||
33 | Christoph Holste (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-05-24 | |||
35 | Matej Sucurovic (from 2005-04-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-05-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
11 | Gunter Thiebaut (until 2005-12-31) | 1977-01-12 | |||
17 | Bjorn Tarillon (until 2005-01-19) | 1981-08-13 | |||
19 | Henrich Bencik (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-10-04 | |||
23 | Yilmaz Ortulu (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-03-30 | |||
25 | Peter Buljan (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-07-14 | |||
36 | Taifour Diane (until 2006-12-31) | 1972-11-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2004-08-21 14:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |