Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hermann Gerland (until 2009-04-26) | 1954-06-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gerd Muller (until 2014-06-30) | 1945-11-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Michael Rensing (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-05-14 | ||||
Jan Schlosser (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-09-27 | ||||
Markus Grunberger (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-08-29 | ||||
Johannes Hocker (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-01-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Gorlitz (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-01-31 | ||||
Jan Mauersberger (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-06-17 | ||||
Philipp Rehm (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-01-14 | ||||
Michael Stegmayer (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-01-12 | ||||
Samuel Kuffour (from 2005-01-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-09-03 | ||||
Patrice M'Bock (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-04-20 | ||||
Christian Endler (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-09-11 | ||||
Thomas Linke (from 2005-03-01) (until 2005-03-02) | 1969-12-26 | ||||
Willy Sagnol (from 2004-09-21) (until 2004-09-23) | 1977-03-18 | ||||
2 | Timo Heinze (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-02-23 | |||
4 | Georg Niedermeier (until 2009-01-29) | 1986-02-26 | |||
5 | Christian Saba (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-12-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Fabian Muller (from 2005-05-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-11-06 | ||||
Thorsten Fink (until 2006-06-30) | 1967-10-29 | ||||
Andreas Ottl (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-03-01 | ||||
Markus Steinhofer (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-03-07 | ||||
Rainer Storhas (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-02-01 | ||||
Jose Ortiz (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-11-17 | ||||
Tobias Rau (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-12-31 | ||||
Bastian Schweinsteiger (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-08-01 | ||||
Stefan Buck (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-09-03 | ||||
Daniel Jungwirth (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-01-15 | ||||
Paul Thomik (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-01-25 | ||||
Johannes Hintersberger (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-03-16 | ||||
Maximilian Wagner (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-03-17 | ||||
Piotr Trochowski (until 2004-10-31) | 1984-03-22 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Borut Semler (until 2007-01-17) | 1985-02-25 | ||||
Roque Santa Cruz (from 2005-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-08-16 | ||||
Paolo Guerrero (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-01-01 | ||||
Alexander Zickler (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-02-28 | ||||
Erdal Kilicarslan (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-08-23 | ||||
Serkan Atak (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-01-03 | ||||
Sebastian Heidinger (until 2005-06-30) | 1986-01-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2004-08-22 15:00 |
7 : 6 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2004-09-22 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2004-11-09 19:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2005-03-01 19:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |