Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Franke (until 2005-12-15) | 1944-12-20 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Meinhard Hemp (until 2005-12-15) | 1942-12-10 | ||||
Sven Kohler (until 2005-12-14) | 1966-02-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Ignjac Kresic (until 2006-06-30) | 1966-10-19 | |||
23 | Oliver Herber (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-09-09 | |||
24 | Darko Horvat (from 2004-12-17) (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-05-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dexter Langen (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-12-16 | |||
3 | Volker Oppitz (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-02-16 | |||
5 | Levente Csik (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-04-29 | |||
12 | Torsten Bittermann (until 2005-06-30) | 1968-02-03 | |||
15 | Andre Weiss (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-10-05 | |||
16 | Robert Heisse (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-07-18 | |||
19 | Jan Seifert (until 2005-06-30) | 1968-10-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Marco Christ (until 2005-08-29) | 1980-11-06 | |||
7 | Rico Kuhne (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-02-19 | |||
8 | Christian Hauser (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-01-13 | |||
10 | Steffen Heidrich (until 2005-06-30) | 1967-07-19 | |||
13 | Christian Frohlich (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-10-27 | |||
14 | Alen Basic (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-09-20 | |||
17 | Daniel Ziebig (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-01-21 | |||
18 | Karsten Oswald (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-06-30 | |||
21 | Rene Beuchel (until 2007-12-31) | 1973-07-31 | |||
26 | Mariusz Kukielka (from 2005-01-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-11-07 | |||
35 | Ansgar Brinkmann (from 2005-01-06) (until 2005-12-31) | 1969-07-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
4 | Ronny Scholze (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-09-17 | |||
9 | Klemen Lavric (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-06-12 | |||
11 | Thomas Neubert (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-11-14 | |||
20 | Joshua Kennedy (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-08-20 | |||
22 | Svilen Stoilov (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-08-23 | |||
31 | Daniel Wansi (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-02-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2004-08-22 14:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |