Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jurgen Roth-Lebenstedt (until 2006-06-30) | 1962-10-22 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Paul Linz (until 2005-05-23) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Arno Michels (until 2005-10-24) | 1967-09-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Ischdonat (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-06-09 | |||
21 | Enrico Keller (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-08-17 | |||
24 | Dario Kresic (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-01-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Tom Schnell (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-10-08 | ||||
3 | Alexander Adrian (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-08-28 | |||
4 | Igor Budisa (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-09-23 | |||
5 | Milan Drageljevic (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-02-28 | |||
6 | Harry Koch (until 2006-06-30) | 1969-11-15 | |||
19 | Miodrag Latinovic (until 2005-01-31) | 1970-08-29 | |||
25 | Sebastian Pelzer (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-09-24 | |||
28 | Thomas Reis (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-10-04 | |||
29 | Stefan Fleck (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-04-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Carsten Marell (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-09-08 | |||
7 | Claus Grzeskowiak (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-12-30 | |||
8 | Catalin Racanel (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-09-23 | |||
10 | Dawit Siradse (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-10-21 | |||
12 | Jens Robben (until 2006-01-08) | 1983-04-27 | |||
13 | Milorad Pekovic (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-08-05 | |||
14 | Sebastian Zimmer (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-08-31 | |||
15 | Sebastian Becker (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-04-10 | |||
16 | Matthias Keller (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-11-20 | |||
20 | Daniel Bauer (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-10-17 | |||
27 | Samir Louadj (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-12-09 | |||
31 | Zoran Mamic (from 2004-09-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1971-09-30 | |||
32 | Gustav Schulz (from 2005-01-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-06-27 | |||
33 | Jesus Sinisterra (from 2005-01-26) (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-09-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Nico Patschinski (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-11-08 | |||
11 | Antun Labak (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-07-14 | |||
17 | Sebastian Radtke (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-04-03 | |||
18 | Michael Fleck (until 2005-12-31) | 1981-01-06 | |||
22 | Marijo Maric (from 2004-12-13) (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-01-12 | |||
22 | David Zdrilic (until 2004-12-31) | 1974-04-13 | |||
23 | Thomas Klasen (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-09-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2004-08-22 15:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2004-09-21 19:00 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2004-11-09 19:00 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |