Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heiko Weber (until 2007-04-11) | 1965-06-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Marco Kampfe (until 2007-04-11) | 1971-11-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Boris Jovanovic (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-07-23 | ||||
12 | Daniel Kraus (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-05-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Faruk Hujdurovic (until 2005-12-31) | 1970-05-14 | ||||
Gert Muller (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-08-10 | ||||
3 | Thorsten Gorke (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-09-22 | |||
4 | Krzysztof Kowalik (until 2007-06-30) | 1971-12-28 | |||
5 | Alexander Maul (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-09-24 | |||
8 | Ralf Schmidt (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-10-09 | |||
15 | Toni Wachsmuth (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-11-15 | |||
22 | Felix Holzner (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-06-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Kais Manai (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-11-07 | ||||
Robert Bohme (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-10-10 | ||||
Olaf Holetschek (until 2005-06-30) | 1968-07-12 | ||||
Sven Hartwig (from 2005-01-17) (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-07-08 | ||||
Patrick Leutloff (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-06-11 | ||||
Vito Benedetti (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-01-05 | ||||
2 | Ronny Thielemann (from 2005-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-11-15 | |||
7 | Torsten Ziegner (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-11-09 | |||
9 | Tobias Werner (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-07-19 | |||
16 | Andreas Keil (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-11-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Miroslav Jovic (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-03-25 | ||||
Manuel Endres (from 2005-01-01) (until 2005-12-31) | 1979-03-25 | ||||
Andreas Schwesinger (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-06-17 | ||||
Sebastian Wille (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-07-07 | ||||
10 | Sebastian Hahnge (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-03-11 | |||
11 | Mark Zimmermann (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-03-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2004-08-21 19:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |