Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Andreas Bergmann (until 2006-11-20) | 1959-06-18 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Andre Trulsen (until 2007-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Achim Hollerieth (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-09-24 | |||
20 | Frank Droge (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-05-08 | |||
31 | Benedikt Pliquett (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-12-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Hempen (until 2006-09-30) | 1974-08-30 | ||||
2 | Florian Lechner (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-03-03 | |||
4 | Fabio Morena (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-03-19 | |||
14 | Marcel Eger (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-03-23 | |||
26 | Ralph Gunesch (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-09-02 | |||
33 | Robert Palikuca (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-05-24 | |||
40 | Andre Trulsen (from 2005-01-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Daniel Ahrens (from 2004-10-01) (until 2004-12-31) | 1982-01-08 | ||||
3 | Marinko Miletic (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-10-08 | |||
5 | Hauke Bruckner (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-02-29 | |||
6 | Michel Mazingu-Dinzey (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-10-15 | |||
7 | Andreas Mayer (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-09-13 | |||
10 | Ifet Taljevic (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-06-12 | |||
16 | Heiko Ansorge (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-04-18 | |||
17 | Fabian Boll (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-06-16 | |||
18 | Mathias Hinzmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-01-02 | |||
22 | Mourad Bounoua (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-07-30 | |||
23 | Benjamin Adrion (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-03-31 | |||
24 | Marc Nielsen (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-08-10 | |||
24 | Willem Hupkes (until 2004-12-31) | 1979-10-19 | |||
25 | Marius Flatken (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-05-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Rico Hanke (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-08-04 | |||
11 | Philip Albrecht (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-11-21 | |||
12 | Rocky Siberie (from 2004-08-23) (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-03-24 | |||
13 | Cosmin Uilacan (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-11-05 | |||
15 | Festus Agu (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-03-13 | |||
19 | Sebastian Wojcik (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-11-07 | |||
27 | Jeton Arifi (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-06-02 | |||
28 | Yusuf Akbel (until 2005-08-03) | 1984-07-31 | |||
29 | Femi Smith (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-08-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2004-08-20 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |