Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Herbert Becker (until 2007-06-30) | 1964-11-16 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Weidemann (from 2004-11-28) (until 2007-11-12) | 1963-06-14 | ||||
Massimo Morales (until 2004-11-27) | 1964-04-20 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Uwe Klein (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-01-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Carsten Nulle (until 2006-02-15) | 1975-07-25 | |||
12 | Sven Najemnik (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-10-07 | |||
22 | Patrick Deuss (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-08-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Gerrit Burk (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-06-13 | |||
3 | Augustine Fregene (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-03-31 | |||
4 | Dirk Bocker (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-02-23 | |||
5 | Victor Lorenzon (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-05-22 | |||
16 | Julius Steegmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-08-03 | |||
19 | Victor Bocchio (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-05-06 | |||
23 | Laurent Guthleber (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-10-26 | |||
27 | Mile Bozic (from 2005-02-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-11-06 | |||
28 | Hamza Cakir (from 2004-10-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-09-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Nicolaj Hust (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-10-30 | |||
7 | Thomas Hoersen (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-01-11 | |||
8 | Markus Losch (until 2005-06-30) | 1971-09-26 | |||
12 | Ben Abelski (from 2005-04-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-09-19 | |||
13 | Axel Bellinghausen (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-05-17 | |||
14 | Tim Kruse (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-01-10 | |||
17 | Andreas Lambertz (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-10-15 | |||
21 | Marcel Ndjeng (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-05-06 | |||
24 | Lucas Marzok (from 2004-11-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-02-01 | |||
25 | Mariano Pasini (from 2004-08-20) (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-10-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Murat Gumustas (from 2004-10-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-04-24 | ||||
9 | Frank Mayer (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-07-26 | |||
10 | Serhij Tytartschuk (until 2005-01-28) | 1979-10-07 | |||
11 | Gustav Policella (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-09-14 | |||
15 | Sanshiro Matsumoto (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-05-03 | |||
18 | Andreas Neumeyer (until 2005-01-19) | 1984-10-02 | |||
19 | Ivan Pusic (from 2005-05-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-03-03 | |||
20 | Marcel Podszus (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-08-20 | |||
26 | Walter Otta (from 2004-09-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-12-12 | |||
29 | Engin Kizilaslan (from 2004-11-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-08-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2004-08-21 15:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |