Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Gadinger (until 2012-03-27) | 1956-07-06 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Edmund Becker (from 2005-01-13) (until 2009-08-19) | 1956-07-18 | ||||
Reinhold Fanz (from 2004-12-28) (until 2005-01-04) | 1954-01-16 | ||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (until 2004-12-20) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Edmund Becker (until 2005-01-12) | 1956-07-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Martin Fischer (until 2005-06-30) | 1969-12-17 | |||
14 | Markus Miller (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-04-08 | |||
33 | Jean-Francois Kornetzky (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-07-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Kai Oswald (until 2006-01-31) | 1977-11-29 | |||
4 | Christian Kritzer (until 2005-12-31) | 1977-02-09 | |||
5 | Mario Eggimann (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-01-24 | |||
16 | Martin Stoll (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-02-09 | |||
22 | Thomas Kies (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-10-16 | |||
23 | Florian Dick (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-11-09 | |||
24 | Carsten Rothenbach (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-09-03 | |||
26 | Marcus Mann (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-03-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Bradley Carnell (from 2005-01-21) (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-01-21 | |||
6 | Christian Hassa (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-10-03 | |||
7 | Ralf Becker (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-09-26 | |||
8 | Danny Schwarz (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-05-11 | |||
10 | Abderrahim Ouakili (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-12-12 | |||
12 | Jan Manner (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-08-27 | |||
13 | Michael Mutzel (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-09-27 | |||
17 | Timo Staffeldt (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-02-09 | |||
20 | Godfried Aduobe (from 2005-01-29) (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-10-29 | |||
21 | Ioannis Masmanidis (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-03-09 | |||
27 | Alexander Mladenow (from 2004-09-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-06-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Daniel Reule (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-05-02 | ||||
9 | Edmond Kapllani (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-07-31 | |||
11 | Sean Dundee (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-12-07 | |||
15 | Abdul Iyodo (until 2005-01-20) | 1979-10-10 | |||
19 | Mamadou Kante (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-12-28 | |||
34 | Iwan Sajenko (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-10-17 | |||
35 | Sebastian Freis (from 2004-10-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-04-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2004-08-22 14:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2004-09-21 19:00 |
3 : 0 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2004-11-09 19:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |