Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Uwe Zimmermann (until 2006-06-30) | 1962-02-11 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Frantisek Straka (from 2005-03-07) (until 2005-10-25) | 1958-05-21 | ||||
Rene Hecker (from 2005-03-02) (until 2005-03-06) | 1967-12-07 | ||||
Ingo Peter (until 2005-03-01) | 1951-10-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Artur Platek (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-06-02 | ||||
Rene Hecker (from 2005-03-10) (until 2005-06-30) | 1967-12-07 | ||||
Asif Saric (until 2004-12-31) | 1965-01-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Bernd Meier (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | |||
23 | Michael Ratajczak (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-04-16 | |||
29 | Sebastian Volzow (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-02-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Marko Tredup (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-05-15 | |||
3 | Stefan Fengler (until 2007-06-30) | 1968-04-02 | |||
4 | Abdoul Thiam (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-06-19 | |||
6 | Jens Langeneke (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-03-29 | |||
12 | Gledson (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-09-04 | |||
18 | Petar Djenic (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-04-14 | |||
25 | Sascha Brinker (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-08-23 | |||
33 | Sladan Asanin (until 2005-06-30) | 1971-08-13 | |||
40 | Dominique Ndjeng (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-11-04 | |||
44 | Andrei (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-02-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Zoran Mamic (until 2004-08-31) | 1971-09-30 | |||
7 | Musemestre Bamba (until 2007-06-30) | 1971-11-10 | |||
8 | Zeljko Sopic (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-07-24 | |||
11 | Daniel Felgenhauer (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-05-10 | |||
14 | Paulinho (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-07-18 | |||
15 | Dennis Hillebrand (until 2004-08-31) | 1979-11-30 | |||
16 | Sasa Radulovic (until 2005-02-15) | 1978-07-31 | |||
20 | Christian Mikolajczak (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-05-15 | |||
22 | Tim Gorschluter (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-08-24 | |||
24 | Mitja Schafer (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-02-27 | |||
26 | Cihan Yilmaz (until 2005-01-17) | 1983-06-15 | |||
31 | Nils-Ole Book (from 2005-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-02-17 | |||
32 | Vladimir Jugovic (until 2005-06-30) | 1969-08-30 | |||
35 | Ovid Hajou (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-11-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Marcel Rath (until 2005-01-10) | 1975-09-03 | |||
10 | Babacar N'Diaye (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-12-12 | |||
17 | Daniel Thioune (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-07-21 | |||
19 | Cyrille Bella (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-06-11 | |||
21 | Denis Omerbegovic (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-03-11 | |||
28 | Rene Lewejohann (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-02-13 | |||
30 | Damir Pekic (from 2005-01-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-01-15 | |||
37 | Stanko Svitlica (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-05-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2004-08-20 19:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2004-09-21 19:00 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2004-11-10 19:00 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |