Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Michael Stahl (until 2005-06-30) | 1959-12-09 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Eugen Hach (from 2004-11-03) (until 2005-06-30) | 1960-09-19 | ||||
Jurgen Luginger (from 2004-10-29) (until 2004-11-02) | 1967-12-08 | ||||
Jorn Andersen (until 2004-10-28) | 1963-02-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Luginger (from 2004-11-03) (until 2005-06-30) | 1967-12-08 | ||||
Jurgen Luginger (until 2004-10-28) | 1967-12-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Adler (until 2005-06-30) | 1967-10-14 | |||
18 | Matko Kalinic (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-05-16 | |||
28 | Christian Borkel (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-04-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Gauthier Remacle (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-05-26 | |||
3 | Anthony Tieku (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-03-16 | |||
4 | Andre Astorga (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-01-07 | |||
5 | Marius Baciu (from 2004-08-30) (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-05-01 | |||
6 | Thomas Cichon (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-07-09 | |||
12 | Adrian Aliaj (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-09-24 | |||
15 | Benjamin Reichert (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-05-17 | |||
17 | Monir Ibrahim (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-08-22 | |||
30 | Hugo Costa (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-11-04 | |||
40 | Dalibor Gataric (from 2005-05-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1986-05-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Mike Rietpietsch (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-03-26 | |||
8 | David Montero (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-01-16 | |||
10 | Bojko Welitschkow (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-02-04 | |||
11 | Chiquinho (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-03-21 | |||
13 | Stijn Haeldermans (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-04-22 | |||
17 | Ralf Keidel (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-03-06 | |||
19 | Moustapha Salifou (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-06-01 | |||
20 | Alassane Ouedraogo (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-09-07 | |||
22 | Jurgen Luginger (until 2005-06-30) | 1967-12-08 | |||
23 | Dennis Dornauer (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-01-20 | |||
26 | Umit Ertural (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-10-22 | |||
35 | Gerd Wimmer (from 2004-10-12) (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-01-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Salif Keita (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-10-19 | |||
9 | Caio (until 2004-09-16) | 1975-08-16 | |||
14 | Leandro Simioni (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-09-29 | |||
16 | Tibor Tokody (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-09-01 | |||
27 | Abdou Ouro-Akpo (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-06-05 | |||
34 | Peter Bajzat (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-06-22 | |||
36 | Geoffrey Roman (from 2004-11-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-02-26 | |||
37 | Nico Frommer (from 2005-01-05) (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-04-08 | |||
41 | Danijel Gataric (from 2005-05-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1986-05-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2004-08-21 15:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2004-09-22 19:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |