Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Volker Finke (until 2007-06-30) | 1948-03-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Karsten Neitzel (until 2007-06-30) | 1967-12-17 | ||||
Achim Sarstedt (until 2007-06-30) | 1959-10-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Richard Golz (until 2006-06-30) | 1968-06-05 | |||
24 | Timo Reus (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-05-02 | |||
36 | Julian Reinard (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-03-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Daniel Schumann (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-02-13 | |||
3 | Youssef Mohamad (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-07-01 | |||
4 | Otar Chisaneischwili (from 2005-01-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-09-26 | |||
5 | Oumar Konde (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-08-19 | |||
13 | Stefan Muller (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-03-08 | |||
15 | Bruno Berner (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-11-21 | |||
16 | Lars Hermel (until 2006-06-30) | 1970-09-28 | |||
17 | Boubacar Diarra (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-07-15 | |||
18 | Seyi Olajengbesi (until 2008-01-28) | 1980-11-17 | |||
19 | Andreas Ibertsberger (from 2005-01-07) (until 2008-01-29) | 1982-07-27 | |||
32 | Torge Hollmann (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-01-28 | |||
38 | Dennis Aogo (from 2004-10-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1987-01-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Zlatan Bajramovic (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-08-12 | |||
7 | Lewan Zkitischwili (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-10-10 | |||
10 | Soumaila Coulibaly (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-04-15 | |||
20 | Roda Antar (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-09-12 | |||
21 | Dennis Buhrer (until 2007-12-31) | 1983-03-13 | |||
22 | Sascha Riether (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-03-23 | |||
23 | Wilfried Sanou (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-03-16 | |||
27 | Jonathan Pitroipa (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-04-12 | |||
29 | Tobias Willi (until 2005-01-18) | 1979-12-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Ellery Cairo (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-08-03 | |||
9 | Alexander Iaschwili (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-10-23 | |||
11 | Dennis Kruppke (until 2007-01-28) | 1980-04-01 | |||
12 | Samuel Koejoe (from 2005-01-11) (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-08-17 | |||
14 | Abder Ramdane (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-02-23 | |||
26 | Regis Dorn (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-12-22 | |||
33 | Ibrahim Tanko (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-07-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2004-08-21 15:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2004-09-21 19:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2004-11-10 14:00 |
1 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2005-03-02 20:30 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |