Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Uwe Nagele (until 2006-06-30) | 1964-11-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Hansi Flick (until 2005-11-18) | 1965-02-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Alfred Schon (until 2006-06-30) | 1962-01-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Kevin Knodler (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-03-22 | |||
20 | Thomas Hillenbrand (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-10-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Manuel Kaufmann (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-08-14 | ||||
3 | Sebastian Haag (until 2004-08-31) | 1982-09-13 | |||
4 | Michael Zepek (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-01-19 | |||
5 | Marcel Throm (until 2007-12-31) | 1979-04-21 | |||
12 | Denis Bindnagel (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-06-05 | |||
22 | Kai Muhlbauer (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-09-02 | |||
27 | Christian Daub (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-01-26 | |||
28 | Matthias Orum (until 2007-01-20) | 1975-11-02 | |||
29 | Michael Kummerle (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-04-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Oguzhan Biyik (from 2005-05-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1986-09-28 | ||||
6 | Matthias Born (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-03-09 | |||
8 | Serhat Gulbas (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-12-24 | |||
10 | Thomas Ollhoff (until 2005-09-16) | 1975-06-15 | |||
13 | Martin Lanig (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-07-11 | |||
14 | Michael Oller (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-08-13 | |||
16 | Dragan Paljic (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-04-08 | |||
17 | Sandro Cescutti (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-04-06 | |||
18 | Nevzet Zukic (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-02-09 | |||
19 | Sebastian Hofmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-09-12 | |||
21 | Timo Bottjer (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-05-31 | |||
23 | Heiko Petersen (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-07-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
2 | Bjorn Weber (until 2005-12-31) | 1981-12-19 | |||
7 | Florian Galuschka (until 2004-12-31) | 1982-05-18 | |||
9 | Kai Herdling (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-06-27 | |||
11 | Danny Winkler (until 2005-12-31) | 1973-08-16 | |||
26 | Heiko Throm (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-05-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2004-08-21 18:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |