Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Boger (until 2006-05-23) | 1966-06-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Marco Grote (until 2006-05-23) | 1972-10-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Frech (until 2007-12-31) | 1976-03-26 | |||
23 | Carsten Wehlmann (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-06-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Steffen Hildebrandt (from 2005-04-05) (until 2005-04-06) | 1982-01-12 | ||||
3 | Rouven Schroder (from 2004-08-31) (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-10-18 | |||
4 | Alexander Aischmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-03-15 | |||
5 | Florian Thorwart (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-04-20 | |||
7 | Deniz Dogan (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-10-20 | |||
15 | Marco Laaser (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-01-16 | |||
21 | Timo Neumann (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-05-09 | |||
22 | Ibrahim Turkmen (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-05-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Farai Mbidzo (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-10-06 | |||
8 | Christian Streit (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-06-30 | |||
10 | Francis Bugri (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-11-09 | |||
13 | Artur Zimmermann (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-06-13 | |||
14 | Markus Kullig (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-11-04 | |||
17 | Christian Mockel (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-04-06 | |||
20 | Jan Zimmermann (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-10-05 | |||
27 | Steve Ridder (until 2004-12-31) | 1982-12-29 | |||
33 | Tobias Schweinsteiger (from 2004-08-31) (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-03-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Daniel Barwolf (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-05-13 | |||
11 | Karol Zaborowski (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-06-19 | |||
19 | Riza Karadas (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | |||
26 | Philip Radbruch (until 2004-12-31) | 1981-02-20 | |||
28 | Metin Sari (until 2004-12-31) | 1980-12-15 | |||
30 | Lars Kampf (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-04-30 | |||
34 | Jacob Thomas (until 2006-03-31) | 1977-02-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2004-08-21 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |