Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Tino Vogel (until 2006-08-05) | 1969-05-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ronald Farber (until 2006-06-30) | 1967-03-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jens Golle (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-04-09 | |||
12 | Toni Schroter (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-08-21 | |||
22 | Jiri Hruby (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-08-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Veiko Berger (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-01-27 | |||
4 | Robert Pietsch (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-03-21 | |||
5 | Tino Findeisen (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-06-26 | |||
7 | Sven Gemeiner (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-03-18 | |||
18 | Ardian Dashi (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-08-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Roy Teubel (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-05-15 | ||||
Chris Warmbier (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-08-28 | ||||
6 | Arnd Spranger (until 2005-06-30) | 1969-09-13 | |||
8 | Marco Holzel (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-05-19 | |||
9 | Thomas Risch (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-06-19 | |||
13 | Thomas Pannach (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-08-19 | |||
14 | Rene Schulze (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-10-12 | |||
16 | Carsten Paulick (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-05-20 | |||
19 | Matthias Pannach (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-07-08 | |||
20 | Robert Krause (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-12-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Marcel Schuch (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-05-21 | ||||
10 | Catalin Popa (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-12-14 | |||
11 | Andrij Sapyschni (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-04-08 | |||
15 | Christian Reimann (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-11-28 | |||
21 | Steffen Kellig (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-02-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2004-08-22 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |