Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Rolf Meyer (until 2014-06-30) | 1955-10-03 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Claus-Dieter Wollitz (until 2009-06-30) | 1965-07-19 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heiko Flottmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1957-02-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tino Berbig (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-10-07 | |||
12 | Tobias Langemeyer (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-07-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Matthias Koch (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-02-28 | |||
3 | Jan Schanda (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-08-17 | |||
4 | Dave de Jong (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-04-26 | |||
11 | Andreas Schafer (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-02-05 | |||
14 | Daniel Flottmann (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-08-06 | |||
14 | Fabian Ewertz (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-07-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Yannick Reyering (from 2004-11-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-07-10 | ||||
5 | Bjorn Joppe (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-12-13 | |||
6 | Wolfgang Schutte (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-01-24 | |||
7 | Michael Kugler (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-09-03 | |||
8 | Joe Enochs (until 2008-06-30) | 1971-09-01 | |||
10 | Alexander Nouri (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-08-20 | |||
15 | Carsten Gottwald (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-04-15 | |||
16 | Flavio Faroni (until 2004-12-31) | 1981-08-09 | |||
21 | Oliver Villar (from 2005-03-18) (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-01-05 | |||
24 | Edgar Bernhardt (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-03-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Thomas Reichenberger (until 2010-06-30) | 1974-10-14 | |||
13 | Addy Menga (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-09-28 | |||
17 | Yaw Donkor (until 2004-12-31) | 1980-05-24 | |||
18 | Markus Feldhoff (until 2008-01-30) | 1974-08-29 | |||
21 | Jens Hulsmann (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-08-08 | |||
22 | Ronny Jank (until 2005-12-31) | 1975-12-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2004-08-21 15:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2004-09-21 20:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |