Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Uwe Hain (until 2009-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Michael Kruger (until 2006-10-04) | 1954-05-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Willi Kronhardt (until 2006-10-04) | 1969-02-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
12 | Thorsten Stuckmann (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-03-17 | |||
22 | Alexander Kunze (until 2007-06-30) | 1971-01-12 | |||
32 | Nico Lauenstein (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-01-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dennis Brinkmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-11-22 | |||
5 | Torsten Julich (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-12-01 | |||
6 | Martin Amedick (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-09-06 | |||
13 | Rene Wegner (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-10-30 | |||
15 | Marco Grimm (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-06-16 | |||
19 | Jan Tauer (until 2007-02-28) | 1983-08-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Alessandro Caruso (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-07-04 | |||
4 | Torsten Sumnich (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-10-01 | |||
7 | Benjamin Siegert (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-07-07 | |||
8 | Daniel Graf (until 2007-01-31) | 1977-08-03 | |||
10 | Nermin Celikovic (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-11-27 | |||
14 | Finn Holsing (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-08-09 | |||
16 | Martin Hauswald (until 2007-01-12) | 1982-03-03 | |||
23 | Torsten Lieberknecht (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-08-01 | |||
24 | Kosta Rodrigues (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-08-12 | |||
25 | Mohammed Basar (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-07-21 | |||
26 | Patrick Bick (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-03-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Dustin Heun (until 2006-08-30) | 1984-04-11 | |||
11 | Ahmet Kuru (until 2007-01-06) | 1982-04-23 | |||
17 | Michal Janicki (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-09-29 | |||
18 | Lars Fuchs (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-06-21 | |||
21 | Jurgen Rische (until 2007-06-30) | 1970-10-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2005-08-22 20:25 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2005-10-25 19:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |