Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jurgen Roth-Lebenstedt (until 2006-06-30) | 1962-10-22 | ||||
Manfred Petz (from 2006-01-09) (until 2006-06-30) | 1961-05-05 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Eugen Hach (from 2005-10-25) (until 2006-06-30) | 1960-09-19 | ||||
Michael Prus (until 2005-10-24) | 1968-02-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Arno Michels (until 2005-10-24) | 1967-09-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dario Kresic (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-01-11 | |||
16 | Daniel Ischdonat (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-06-09 | |||
21 | Enrico Keller (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-08-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Stefan Fleck (until 2005-12-31) | 1982-04-26 | |||
3 | Alexander Adrian (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-08-28 | |||
6 | Harry Koch (until 2006-06-30) | 1969-11-15 | |||
10 | Milan Drageljevic (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-02-28 | |||
14 | Nobutaka Suzuki (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-09-12 | |||
19 | Michael Dingels (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-01-04 | |||
20 | Miodrag Latinovic (from 2005-08-23) (until 2006-06-30) | 1970-08-29 | |||
20 | Tom Schnell (until 2005-08-05) | 1985-10-08 | |||
23 | David Thieser (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-07-01 | |||
34 | Edwin Bediako (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-11-02 | |||
36 | Christian Stuff (from 2005-12-21) (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-08-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Markus Losch (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-09-26 | |||
7 | Michael Falkenmayer (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-11-26 | |||
8 | Daniel Bauer (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-10-17 | |||
12 | Jens Robben (until 2006-01-08) | 1983-04-27 | |||
13 | Samir Louadj (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-12-09 | |||
15 | Sebastian Becker (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-04-10 | |||
17 | Gustav Schulz (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-06-27 | |||
30 | Sebastian Zimmer (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-08-31 | |||
37 | Dominik Gross (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-03-02 | |||
43 | Heiko Weber (from 2006-04-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1987-01-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
4 | Angelo Donato (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-02-06 | |||
9 | Najeh Braham (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-05-20 | |||
11 | Thomas Klasen (until 2005-12-31) | 1983-09-16 | |||
18 | Michael Fleck (until 2005-12-31) | 1981-01-06 | |||
22 | Deniz Kacan (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-05-31 | |||
25 | Holger Lemke (until 2006-06-30) | 1987-07-22 | |||
32 | Christian Schmid (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-12-26 | |||
38 | Vitus Nagorny (from 2006-01-20) (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-06-21 | |||
39 | Peter Buljan (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-07-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2005-08-20 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |