Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Ferner (until 2006-06-30) | 1949-01-16 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Marc Schommer (until 2006-06-30) | 1962-06-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Enver Marina (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-01-27 | |||
20 | Christophe Reibel (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-06-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Muhterem Baydar (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-01-31 | ||||
2 | Patrick Kwetsche (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-11-05 | |||
3 | Manuel Cuccu (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-04-24 | |||
4 | Benjamin Paulus (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-03-01 | |||
5 | Artur Lemm (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-03-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Stefan Fleck (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-04-26 | ||||
6 | Levent Yalkin (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-09-26 | |||
7 | Bulent Turker (until 2006-06-30) | 1970-12-31 | |||
8 | Thomas Hofer (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-08-20 | |||
10 | Angelo Bonsignore (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-12-06 | |||
12 | Iwasaki Kazuma (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-01-31 | |||
13 | Roland Klose (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-11-13 | |||
14 | Jan Kuchling (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-03-21 | |||
15 | David Cuccu (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-07-03 | |||
18 | Marc Summa (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-09-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Michael Fleck (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-01-06 | ||||
9 | Marco Dittgen (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-08-19 | |||
11 | Pierre Halle (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-06-18 | |||
16 | Alexander Sosna (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-09-06 | |||
17 | Alexej Gaponenko (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-09-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2005-08-21 17:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |