Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Pavel Dotchev (until 2008-02-08) | 1965-09-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heiko Nowak (until 2008-02-08) | 1968-09-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Ratajczak (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-04-16 | |||
19 | Sebastian Bach (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-01-26 | |||
26 | Stephan Essig (until 2005-12-31) | 1985-02-11 | |||
28 | Dirk Orlishausen (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-08-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Matthias Holst (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-06-19 | |||
4 | Stephan Hanke (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-10-19 | |||
13 | Alexander Schnetzler (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-04-17 | |||
14 | Tom Bertram (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-03-30 | |||
15 | Paulo Scherer (until 2006-12-31) | 1983-02-04 | |||
17 | Jorn Nowak (until 2009-01-21) | 1986-04-25 | |||
21 | Justus Six (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-08-25 | |||
29 | Robert Stark (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-11-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Henry Onwuzuruike (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-12-26 | |||
5 | Bjorn Brunnemann (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-08-06 | |||
6 | Silvio Patz (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-07-11 | |||
7 | Rico Kuhne (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-02-19 | |||
8 | Ilija Gruev (until 2006-06-30) | 1969-10-30 | |||
18 | Tony Schnuphase (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | |||
24 | Carsten Weis (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-01-18 | |||
25 | Andreas Anicic (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-10-29 | |||
32 | Rainer Muller (from 2006-01-01) (until 2007-08-28) | 1986-05-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Martin Ullmann (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-12-11 | ||||
11 | Ronny Hebestreit (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-01-09 | |||
16 | Pavel David (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-10-17 | |||
20 | Joseph Mensah (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | |||
22 | Caysa da Silva (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-07-31 | |||
23 | Christian Beck (from 2006-04-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-03-10 | |||
23 | Robert Fischer (until 2005-12-31) | 1984-05-04 | |||
27 | Sokol Kacani (until 2006-01-31) | 1984-02-16 | |||
30 | Domi Kumbela (from 2006-02-01) (until 2007-12-11) | 1984-04-20 | |||
33 | Andrew Aris (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-12-31) | 1977-07-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2005-08-19 19:30 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2005-10-25 19:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |