Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Klaus-Peter Nemet (until 2011-06-30) | 1953-12-09 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Andreas Bergmann (until 2006-11-20) | 1959-06-18 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Andre Trulsen (until 2007-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Achim Hollerieth (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-09-24 | |||
20 | Frank Droge (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-05-08 | |||
31 | Benedikt Pliquett (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-12-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Hempen (until 2006-09-30) | 1974-08-30 | ||||
Ofosuhene Oduro-Opuni (from 2006-05-06) (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-10-10 | ||||
Jan-Philipp Kalla (from 2006-05-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-08-06 | ||||
Jan-Philipp Rose (from 2006-04-22) (until 2006-04-23) | 1985-12-16 | ||||
2 | Florian Lechner (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-03-03 | |||
3 | Ian Joy (until 2008-01-16) | 1981-07-14 | |||
4 | Fabio Morena (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-03-19 | |||
12 | Nascimento (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-03-14 | |||
14 | Marcel Eger (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-03-23 | |||
26 | Ralph Gunesch (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-09-02 | |||
33 | Robert Palikuca (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-05-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Hauke Bruckner (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-02-29 | |||
6 | Michel Mazingu-Dinzey (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-10-15 | |||
7 | Dennis Tornieporth (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-09-06 | |||
10 | Thomas Meggle (until 2010-06-30) | 1975-02-22 | |||
12 | Timo Schultz (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-08-26 | |||
15 | Johnny Sulentic (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-12-24 | |||
16 | Heiko Ansorge (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-04-18 | |||
17 | Fabian Boll (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-06-16 | |||
18 | Mathias Hinzmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-01-02 | |||
23 | Benjamin Adrion (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-03-31 | |||
28 | Lukasz Sosnowski (from 2006-04-01) (until 2007-01-16) | 1987-01-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Chwitscha Schubitidse (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-08-31 | |||
9 | Sebastian Wojcik (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-11-07 | |||
11 | Jens Scharping (from 2006-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-07-16 | |||
22 | Felix Luz (until 2006-12-31) | 1982-01-18 | |||
27 | Jeton Arifi (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-06-02 | |||
28 | Yusuf Akbel (until 2005-08-03) | 1984-07-31 | |||
29 | Femi Smith (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-08-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2005-08-20 14:30 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2005-10-25 19:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2005-12-21 19:00 |
4 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-01-25 20:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-04-12 20:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |