Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Perry Brautigam (until 2009-06-30) | 1963-03-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Frank Pagelsdorf (from 2005-08-15) (until 2008-11-10) | 1958-02-05 | ||||
Jorg Berger (until 2005-08-12) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Timo Lange (from 2005-08-16) (until 2008-11-10) | 1968-01-19 | ||||
Frank Engel (until 2005-08-12) | 1951-02-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Mathias Schober (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-04-08 | |||
21 | Axel Keller (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-03-25 | |||
25 | Carsten Busch (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-08-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Miso Brecko (from 2005-08-11) (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-05-01 | |||
3 | Martin Pohl (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-04-13 | |||
5 | Kim Madsen (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-02-13 | |||
6 | Ronald Maul (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-02-13 | |||
12 | Marc Stein (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-07-07 | |||
13 | Tim Sebastian (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-01-17 | |||
20 | Patrick Jahn (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-12-31) | 1983-02-22 | |||
23 | Denis Lapaczinski (until 2006-08-25) | 1981-09-26 | |||
28 | Gledson (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-09-04 | |||
30 | Oumar Konde (until 2006-01-16) | 1979-08-19 | |||
31 | Kai Bulow (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-05-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Enrico Gaede (until 2007-01-08) | 1982-01-31 | |||
7 | Rene Rydlewicz (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-07-18 | |||
8 | Dordije Cetkovic (from 2006-01-16) (until 2009-01-07) | 1983-01-03 | |||
8 | David Rasmussen (until 2005-09-07) | 1976-12-01 | |||
10 | Kevin Hansen (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-08-13 | |||
14 | Zsolt Low (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-04-29 | |||
17 | Tobias Rathgeb (from 2006-01-10) (until 2010-01-06) | 1982-05-03 | |||
22 | Flavio Faroni (from 2005-08-23) (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-08-09 | |||
27 | Thomas Rasmussen (until 2005-08-18) | 1977-04-16 | |||
33 | Michael Hartmann (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-07-11 | |||
34 | Anton Muller (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-10-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Enrico Kern (from 2006-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-03-12 | |||
11 | Rade Prica (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-06-30 | |||
15 | Magnus Arvidsson (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-02-12 | |||
18 | Amir Shapourzadeh (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-09-19 | |||
19 | Antonio Di Salvo (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-06-05 | |||
24 | Marcel Schied (until 2008-01-10) | 1983-07-28 | |||
36 | Clemens Lange (until 2006-08-30) | 1986-04-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2005-08-20 15:30 |
2 : 5 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2005-10-26 19:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2005-12-21 19:00 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |