Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Rene Keffel (until 2013-06-30) | 1968-01-14 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Frank (from 2006-01-26) (until 2007-10-30) | 1951-02-21 | ||||
Steffen Menze (from 2006-01-23) (until 2006-01-25) | 1969-01-28 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Boysen (until 2006-01-22) | 1957-05-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Manfred Binz (until 2008-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Cesar Thier (until 2008-06-30) | 1967-10-15 | |||
13 | Sead Ramovic (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-03-14 | |||
17 | Daniel Endres (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-05-16 | |||
23 | Toni Tapalovic (from 2005-12-08) (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-10-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Lars Weissenfeldt (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-02-15 | |||
3 | Markus Happe (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | |||
4 | Bastian Pinske (until 2008-06-30) | 1978-09-19 | |||
5 | Stefan Dolzer (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-07-24 | |||
6 | Daniel Schumann (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-02-13 | |||
19 | Rudiger Rehm (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-11-22 | |||
24 | Matej Miljatovic (from 2006-01-04) (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-06-23 | |||
28 | Heiner Backhaus (from 2006-02-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-02-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Christian Muller (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-08-13 | |||
8 | Stephan Sieger (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-12-03 | |||
10 | Laszlo Kanyuk (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-01-13 | |||
11 | Thorsten Judt (until 2008-06-30) | 1971-06-30 | |||
14 | Thomas Worle (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-02-11 | |||
15 | Alf Mintzel (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-12-21 | |||
18 | Ole Budtz (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-04-20 | |||
21 | Ramazan Yildirim (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-09-07 | |||
22 | Christian Pospischil (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-05-14 | |||
26 | Oualid Mokhtari (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-04-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Regis Dorn (until 2007-01-29) | 1979-12-22 | |||
9 | Suat Turker (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-03-10 | |||
16 | Daniele Fiorentino (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-06-29 | |||
20 | Sasa Ciric (until 2006-06-30) | 1968-01-11 | |||
25 | Wandeir (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-05-15 | |||
27 | Momo Diabang (from 2006-01-23) (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-01-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2005-08-20 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2005-10-26 19:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2005-12-21 19:00 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-01-25 19:00 |
4 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |