Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Zsolt Petry (until 2009-06-30) | 1966-09-23 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jos Luhukay (until 2006-08-11) | 1963-06-13 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Markus Gellhaus (until 2006-08-11) | 1970-06-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lukas Kruse (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-07-09 | |||
14 | Stephan Loboue (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-08-23 | |||
33 | Tom Starke (from 2006-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-03-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | David Fall (until 2008-06-30) | 1978-02-27 | |||
3 | Markus Bollmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-01-06 | |||
4 | Miodrag Latinovic (until 2005-08-22) | 1970-08-29 | |||
5 | Dusko Djurisic (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-12-20 | |||
15 | Roel Brouwers (from 2005-08-05) (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-11-28 | |||
16 | Thorsten Becker (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-05-13 | |||
24 | Marc Gouiffe a Goufan (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-04-12 | |||
28 | Edmund Riemer (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-01-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Daniel Brinkmann (until 2007-10-31) | 1986-01-29 | |||
6 | Danijel Stefulj (until 2005-12-26) | 1973-06-02 | |||
7 | Stephan Maass (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-08-20 | |||
10 | Guido Spork (until 2006-01-19) | 1975-01-03 | |||
12 | Garry De Graef (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-10-21 | |||
17 | Bernhard Erkinger (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-04-30 | |||
17 | Daniel Cartus (until 2005-12-31) | 1978-09-02 | |||
18 | Markus Krosche (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-09-17 | |||
19 | Mehmet Dragusha (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-10-09 | |||
20 | Huzeyfe Dogan (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-01-01 | |||
21 | Marcel Ndjeng (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-05-06 | |||
22 | Benjamin Schussler (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-05-04 | |||
25 | Oliver Brocke (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-01-15 | |||
34 | Ardian Jevric (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-07-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Dennis Schulp (until 2008-01-06) | 1978-01-18 | |||
9 | Sebastian Schoof (from 2006-01-09) (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-03-22 | |||
11 | Rene Muller (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-05-19 | |||
23 | Albert Bunjaku (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-11-29 | |||
27 | Sven Krause (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-01-19 | |||
32 | Radovan Vujanovic (until 2005-12-06) | 1982-02-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2005-08-20 15:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |