Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Gunther Reichold (until 2013-06-30) | 1965-06-10 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Benno Mohlmann (until 2007-06-30) | 1954-08-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Werner Dressel (until 2007-06-30) | 1958-08-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Borut Mavric (until 2007-03-06) | 1970-03-27 | |||
22 | Sven Neuhaus (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-04-04 | |||
27 | Jasmin Fejzic (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-05-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Michael Rundio (until 2006-01-31) | 1983-01-21 | |||
3 | Tomas Votava (until 2005-12-31) | 1974-02-21 | |||
4 | Andre Mijatovic (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-12-03 | |||
5 | Thomas Kleine (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-12-28 | |||
12 | Christian Weber (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-09-15 | |||
20 | Ales Kokot (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-10-23 | |||
21 | Frederic Page (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-12-28 | |||
24 | Josef Lastovka (until 2007-01-24) | 1982-02-20 | |||
26 | Michael Kramer (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-12-09 | |||
32 | Timo Achenbach (from 2005-08-02) (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-09-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Barbaros Barut (until 2007-01-28) | 1983-01-26 | |||
7 | Florian Sturm (until 2005-12-31) | 1982-05-06 | |||
8 | Mathias Surmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-12-19 | |||
11 | Daniel Felgenhauer (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-05-10 | |||
14 | Benjamin Fuchs (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-10-20 | |||
16 | Juri Judt (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-07-24 | |||
17 | Stephan Schrock (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-08-21 | |||
19 | Roberto Hilbert (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-10-16 | |||
25 | Daniel Adlung (until 2006-06-30) | 1987-10-01 | |||
28 | Hans Andreasen (from 2005-08-31) (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-01-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Danny Fuchs (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-02-25 | |||
10 | Marcus Feinbier (until 2005-08-30) | 1969-11-30 | |||
13 | George Koumantarakis (until 2005-11-30) | 1974-03-27 | |||
14 | Tomislav Erceg (until 2005-12-31) | 1971-10-22 | |||
15 | Torsten Oehrl (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-01-07 | |||
18 | Christian Eigler (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-01-01 | |||
23 | Christian Timm (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-02-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2005-08-21 15:00 |
10 : 9 PSO |
Schema Compare |