Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Sirch (until 2006-06-30) | 1961-12-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Walter Schachner (from 2006-01-24) (until 2007-03-17) | 1957-02-01 | ||||
Reiner Maurer (until 2006-01-22) | 1960-02-16 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gunther Gorenzel-Simonitsch (from 2006-01-24) (until 2008-08-31) | 1971-10-10 | ||||
Bernhard Trares (until 2006-06-30) | 1965-08-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Hofmann (until 2009-06-30) | 1972-11-03 | |||
12 | Timo Ochs (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-10-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Fabian Lamotte (until 2007-01-18) | 1983-02-25 | |||
3 | Remo Meyer (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-11-12 | |||
4 | Quido Lanzaat (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-09-30 | |||
5 | Slobodan Komljenovic (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-01-02 | |||
7 | Rodrigo Costa (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-07-30 | |||
21 | Christoph Janker (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-08-16) | 1985-02-14 | |||
26 | Patrick Milchraum (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-05-26 | |||
30 | Lukas Szukala (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-05-26 | |||
33 | Fabian Johnson (from 2006-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-12-11 | |||
35 | Marcel Schafer (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-06-07 | |||
44 | Torben Hoffmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-10-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Roman Tyce (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-05-07 | |||
8 | Jiayi Shao (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-04-10 | |||
10 | Steffen Hofmann (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-09-09 | |||
13 | Harald Cerny (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-09-13 | |||
14 | Marco Gebhardt (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-10-07 | |||
16 | Christian Holzer (until 2005-12-31) | 1979-01-20 | |||
19 | Matthias Lehmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-05-28 | |||
24 | Daniel Baier (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-05-18 | |||
25 | Nikolas Ledgerwood (from 2006-01-01) (until 2007-01-16) | 1985-01-16 | |||
27 | Bjorn Ziegenbein (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-04-30 | |||
28 | Pascal Ojigwe (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-12-11 | |||
33 | Lance Davids (until 2005-08-30) | 1985-04-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Stefan Reisinger (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-09-14 | |||
11 | Michal Kolomaznik (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-07-20 | |||
17 | Emmanuel Krontiris (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-02-11 | |||
18 | Paul Agostino (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-06-09 | |||
22 | Nicky Adler (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-05-23 | |||
23 | Nemanja Vucicevic (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-08-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2005-08-19 18:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2005-10-26 19:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2005-12-20 19:00 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-01-25 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |