Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Milan Sasic (until 2007-04-23) | 1958-10-18 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Uwe Koschinat (from 2006-01-01) (until 2009-12-13) | 1971-09-01 | ||||
Klaus Sussmeyer (until 2006-12-31) | 1960-03-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Peter Auer (until 2007-06-30) | 1971-07-15 | |||
22 | Alexander Muller (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-02-19 | |||
33 | Michael Gurski (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-03-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Brenny Evers (until 2008-07-25) | 1978-11-08 | |||
5 | Anthony Tieku (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-03-16 | |||
6 | Dubravko Kolinger (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-11-29 | |||
7 | Ralf Klingmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-11-08 | |||
16 | Josh Grenier (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-07-16 | |||
18 | Andreas Richter (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-09-15 | |||
25 | Alassane Ouedraogo (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-09-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Eldin Hadzic (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-11-02 | ||||
3 | Oliver Straube (until 2005-12-31) | 1971-12-13 | |||
4 | Rudiger Ziehl (until 2009-06-30) | 1977-10-26 | |||
8 | Nihad Mujakic (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-01-28 | |||
10 | Anel Dzaka (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-09-19 | |||
14 | Stefan Haben (until 2006-06-30) | 1987-04-02 | |||
15 | Michael Stahl (until 2006-06-30) | 1987-09-15 | |||
17 | Philipp Langen (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-07-02 | |||
20 | Domenico Cozza (until 2006-01-30) | 1983-01-18 | |||
21 | Bruno Meirelles (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-02-23 | |||
26 | Evangelos Nessos (until 2009-06-30) | 1978-06-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Jean-Pierre Rubio-Sanchez (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-08-21 | |||
11 | Josef Ivanovic (from 2006-01-31) (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-12-05 | |||
11 | Denni Patschinsky (until 2005-12-31) | 1983-08-26 | |||
13 | Johannes Rahn (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-01-16 | |||
19 | Salif Keita (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-10-19 | |||
23 | Dimitrijus Guscinas (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-12-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2005-08-20 18:45 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |