Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Michael Kraft (from 2006-01-01) (until 2013-05-24) | 1966-04-23 | ||||
Dieter Burdenski (until 2005-12-31) | 1950-11-26 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 2013-05-14) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Mathias Honerbach (until 2013-05-24) | 1962-04-13 | ||||
Wolfgang Rolff (until 2013-05-14) | 1959-12-26 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 2006-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Andreas Reinke (until 2007-06-30) | 1969-01-10 | |||
18 | Tim Wiese (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-12-17 | |||
30 | Kasper Jensen (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-10-07 | |||
33 | Christian Vander (from 2005-08-12) (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-10-24 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Frank Fahrenhorst (until 2006-08-07) | 1977-09-24 | |||
3 | Petri Pasanen (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-09-24 | |||
4 | Naldo (until 2012-07-18) | 1982-09-10 | |||
6 | Frank Baumann (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-10-29 | |||
15 | Patrick Owomoyela (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-11-05 | |||
23 | Jelle Van Damme (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-10-10 | |||
25 | Francis Banecki (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-07-17 | |||
26 | Florian Mohr (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-08-25 | |||
27 | Christian Schulz (until 2007-08-29) | 1983-04-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Umit Davala (until 2005-12-31) | 1973-07-30 | |||
7 | Jurica Vranjes (until 2010-01-31) | 1980-01-30 | |||
10 | Johan Micoud (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-07-24 | |||
16 | Leon Andreasen (until 2006-12-31) | 1983-04-23 | |||
19 | Pekka Lagerblom (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-10-19 | |||
20 | Daniel Jensen (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-06-25 | |||
22 | Torsten Frings (until 2011-06-30) | 1976-11-22 | |||
24 | Tim Borowski (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-05-02 | |||
29 | Jerome Polenz (from 2006-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1986-11-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Nelson Valdez (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-11-28 | |||
11 | Miroslav Klose (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-06-09 | |||
14 | Aaron Hunt (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-09-04 | |||
17 | Ivan Klasnic (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-01-29 | |||
21 | Mohamed Zidan (until 2005-08-30) | 1981-12-11 | |||
35 | Marco Stier (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-03-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2005-08-20 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2005-10-25 19:30 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2005-12-21 19:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-01-25 20:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |