Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Adam Matysek (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-09-01 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Hans Meyer (until 2008-02-11) | 1942-11-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Raab (until 2008-02-11) | 1958-12-20 | ||||
Dieter Lieberwirth (until 2007-06-30) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Raphael Schafer (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-01-30 | |||
18 | Daniel Klewer (until 2010-06-30) | 1977-03-04 | |||
30 | Alexander Stephan (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-09-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Michael Beauchamp (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-03-08 | |||
4 | Glauber (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-08-05 | |||
5 | Andreas Wolf (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-06-12 | |||
7 | Marek Nikl (until 2007-09-17) | 1976-02-20 | |||
16 | Dean Heffernan (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-05-19 | |||
23 | Matthew Spiranovic (from 2007-01-01) (until 2010-01-06) | 1988-06-27 | |||
25 | Javier Pinola (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-02-24 | |||
28 | Dominik Reinhardt (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-12-19 | |||
31 | Thomas Paulus (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-03-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Tomas Galasek (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-01-15 | |||
8 | Jan Polak (until 2007-07-31) | 1981-03-14 | |||
10 | Ivica Banovic (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-08-02 | |||
11 | Marek Mintal (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-09-02 | |||
19 | Jan Kristiansen (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-08-04 | |||
22 | Marco Engelhardt (until 2008-12-31) | 1980-12-02 | |||
24 | Vratislav Gresko (from 2006-09-07) (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-07-24 | |||
34 | Sebastian Huber (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-05-17 | |||
36 | Jaouhar Mnari (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-11-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Gerald Sibon (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-04-19 | |||
13 | Iwan Sajenko (from 2007-01-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-10-17 | |||
20 | Joshua Kennedy (until 2008-01-10) | 1982-08-20 | |||
21 | Markus Schroth (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-01-25 | |||
23 | Iwan Sajenko (until 2006-12-31) | 1983-10-17 | |||
26 | Christoph Weber (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-08-26 | |||
32 | Leon Benko (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-11-11 | |||
33 | Robert Vittek (until 2008-08-28) | 1982-04-01 | |||
35 | Chhunly Pagenburg (until 2007-12-31) | 1986-11-10 | |||
40 | Petar Jelic (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-10-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-10-25 19:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2006-12-19 19:30 |
2 : 1 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2007-02-27 19:00 |
4 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2007-04-17 20:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2007-05-26 20:00 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |