Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Emmerling (until 2007-06-30) | 1966-02-10 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Franz Stolz (until 2012-07-30) | 1956-09-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Daniel Schell (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-06-01 | ||||
Marcus Hesse (from 2006-09-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-03-22 | ||||
Christian Pauly (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-12-05 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Sabacinski (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-02-11 | ||||
Felix Haas (from 2007-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-04-13 | ||||
Mirko Casper (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-03-01 | ||||
Soren Pruter (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-03-16 | ||||
Dominik Pawolka (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-05-06 | ||||
Christian Nohlen (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-09-10 | ||||
Michael Denkewitz (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-07-20 | ||||
Florian Schacken (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-01-19 | ||||
Alexander Karachristos (until 2006-12-31) | 1987-04-07 | ||||
Thomas Stehle (from 2006-09-24) (until 2006-09-24) | 1980-10-26 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Faton Popova (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-12-22 | ||||
Nico Schmied (from 2007-05-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-05-10 | ||||
Kamil Niewiadomski (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-09-10 | ||||
Ben Manga (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-02-11 | ||||
Matthias Heidrich (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-12-10 | ||||
Thomas Tennagels (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-09-04 | ||||
Pascal Muller (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-06-04 | ||||
Mario Mutsch (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-09-03 | ||||
Yunus Balaban (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-02-24 | ||||
Lucas Domgorgen (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-07-10 | ||||
Tom Moosmayer (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-10-01 | ||||
Gordon Addai (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-01-30 | ||||
Emil Noll (from 2006-08-01) (until 2006-12-20) | 1978-11-21 | ||||
Matthias Lehmann (from 2006-09-01) (until 2006-09-30) | 1983-05-28 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Abdul Ozgen (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-09-08 | ||||
Marco Quotschalla (from 2007-04-08) (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-07-25 | ||||
Murat Gumustas (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-04-24 | ||||
Aurelien Joachim (from 2007-01-31) (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-08-10 | ||||
Philipp Dunkel (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-02-22 | ||||
Milko Trisic (until 2006-12-31) | 1987-01-22 | ||||
Szilard Nemeth (from 2006-11-04) (until 2006-11-05) | 1977-08-08 | ||||
Erwin Koen (until 2006-08-31) | 1978-09-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 18:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |