Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Sepp Maier (until 2008-06-30) | 1944-02-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ottmar Hitzfeld (from 2007-02-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1949-01-12 | ||||
Felix Magath (until 2007-01-31) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Henke (from 2007-02-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Seppo Eichkorn (until 2007-01-31) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Kahn (until 2008-06-30) | 1969-06-15 | |||
22 | Michael Rensing (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-05-14 | |||
29 | Bernd Dreher (until 2008-06-30) | 1966-11-02 | |||
33 | Thomas Kraft (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-07-22 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Willy Sagnol (until 2009-01-31) | 1977-03-18 | |||
3 | Lucio (until 2009-06-30) | 1978-05-08 | |||
5 | Daniel Van Buyten (until 2014-06-30) | 1978-02-07 | |||
6 | Martin Demichelis (until 2010-12-31) | 1980-12-20 | |||
18 | Andreas Gorlitz (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-01-31 | |||
21 | Philipp Lahm (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-11-11 | |||
25 | Valerien Ismael (until 2007-12-31) | 1975-09-28 | |||
30 | Christian Lell (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-08-29 | |||
32 | Mats Hummels (until 2008-01-02) | 1988-12-16 | |||
37 | Christian Saba (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-12-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Mehmet Scholl (until 2007-06-30) | 1970-10-16 | |||
8 | Ali Karimi (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-11-08 | |||
17 | Mark van Bommel (from 2006-08-28) (until 2011-01-24) | 1977-04-22 | |||
19 | Julio Dos Santos (until 2006-12-31) | 1983-05-07 | |||
20 | Hasan Salihamidzic (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-01-01 | |||
23 | Owen Hargreaves (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-01-20 | |||
26 | Sebastian Deisler (until 2007-01-16) | 1980-01-05 | |||
31 | Bastian Schweinsteiger (until 2015-07-13) | 1984-08-01 | |||
36 | Stephan Furstner (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-09-11 | |||
39 | Andreas Ottl (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-03-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
10 | Roy Makaay (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-03-09 | |||
11 | Lukas Podolski (until 2009-06-30) | 1985-06-04 | |||
14 | Claudio Pizarro (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-10-03 | |||
24 | Roque Santa Cruz (until 2007-06-27) | 1981-08-16 | |||
34 | Stefan Maierhofer (until 2007-01-30) | 1982-08-16 | |||
38 | Louis N'Gwat-Mahop (from 2007-05-12) (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-09-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 20:15 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-10-25 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-12-20 20:30 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |