Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Wolfgang de Beer (until 2014-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Doll (from 2007-03-13) (until 2008-05-19) | 1966-04-09 | ||||
Jurgen Rober (from 2006-12-19) (until 2007-03-12) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Bert van Marwijk (until 2006-12-18) | 1952-05-19 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ronny Teuber (from 2007-03-13) (until 2008-06-30) | 1965-09-01 | ||||
Ralf Zumdick (from 2007-03-13) (until 2008-06-30) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Bernd Storck (from 2006-12-20) (until 2007-03-12) | 1963-01-25 | ||||
Dick Voorn (until 2006-12-20) | 1948-10-30 | ||||
Egid Kiesouw (until 2006-12-20) | 1962-09-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Roman Weidenfeller (until 2018-06-30) | 1980-08-06 | |||
20 | Bernd Meier (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | |||
34 | Soren Pirson (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-08-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Martin Amedick (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-09-06 | |||
3 | Markus Brzenska (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-05-25 | |||
4 | Christian Worns (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-05-10 | |||
17 | Dede (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-04-18 | |||
21 | Christoph Metzelder (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-11-05 | |||
23 | Philipp Degen (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-02-15 | |||
26 | Marc Heitmeier (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-03-18 | |||
27 | Uwe Hunemeier (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-01-09 | |||
33 | David Vrzogic (until 2010-06-30) | 1989-08-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Sebastian Kehl (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-02-13 | |||
6 | Florian Kringe (until 2009-08-30) | 1982-08-18 | |||
7 | Tinga (from 2006-08-19) (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-01-13 | |||
10 | Steven Pienaar (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-03-17 | |||
16 | Kosi Saka (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-02-04 | |||
18 | Lars Ricken (until 2007-12-31) | 1976-07-10 | |||
22 | Marc-Andre Kruska (until 2009-01-08) | 1987-06-29 | |||
25 | Nuri Sahin (until 2007-06-30) | 1988-09-05 | |||
28 | Sebastian Tyrala (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-02-22 | |||
43 | Daniel Gordon (from 2007-04-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-01-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Delron Buckley (until 2006-08-21) | 1977-12-07 | |||
8 | Matthew Amoah (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-10-24 | |||
9 | Nelson Valdez (until 2010-08-16) | 1983-11-28 | |||
11 | David Odonkor (until 2006-08-28) | 1984-02-21 | |||
13 | Alexander Frei (until 2009-07-15) | 1979-07-15 | |||
14 | Ebi Smolarek (until 2007-08-23) | 1981-01-09 | |||
36 | Abdenour Amachaibou (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-01-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2006-10-24 19:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |