Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Uwe Kamps (until 2014-06-30) | 1964-06-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jos Luhukay (from 2007-02-01) (until 2008-10-05) | 1963-06-13 | ||||
Jupp Heynckes (until 2007-01-30) | 1945-05-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Markus Gellhaus (from 2007-02-06) (until 2008-10-08) | 1970-06-09 | ||||
Walter Junghans (until 2007-02-05) | 1958-10-26 | ||||
Jos Luhukay (from 2007-01-02) (until 2007-01-31) | 1963-06-13 | ||||
Uwe Speidel (until 2006-12-31) | 1971-03-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Kasey Keller (until 2007-06-30) | 1969-11-29 | |||
19 | Christofer Heimeroth (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-08-01 | |||
31 | Michael Melka (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-07-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Tom Gaal (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-03 | ||||
2 | Bo Svensson (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-08-04 | |||
3 | Filip Daems (until 2015-06-30) | 1978-10-31 | |||
4 | Thomas Helveg (until 2007-01-30) | 1971-06-24 | |||
7 | Jeff Strasser (until 2006-08-12) | 1974-10-05 | |||
13 | Jose Antonio (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-03-14 | |||
18 | Tim Rubink (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-01-12 | |||
18 | Milan Fukal (until 2006-08-31) | 1975-05-16 | |||
20 | Kasper Bogelund (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-10-08 | |||
28 | Steve Gohouri (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-02-08 | |||
33 | Marvin Compper (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-06-14 | |||
37 | Tobias Levels (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-11-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Marcell Jansen (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-11-04 | |||
6 | Eugen Polanski (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-03-17 | |||
7 | Mikkel Thygesen (from 2007-01-10) (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-10-22 | |||
8 | Sebastian Svard (until 2009-01-07) | 1983-01-15 | |||
10 | Federico Insua (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-01-03 | |||
14 | Hassan El-Fakiri (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-04-18 | |||
16 | Bernd Thijs (until 2007-08-26) | 1978-06-28 | |||
17 | David Degen (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-02-15 | |||
21 | Johannes van den Bergh (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-11-21 | |||
21 | Niels Oude Kamphuis (until 2006-07-31) | 1977-11-14 | |||
22 | Oliver Kirch (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-08-21 | |||
24 | Peer Kluge (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-11-22 | |||
29 | Alexander Baumjohann (from 2007-01-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-01-23 | |||
36 | Robert Flessers (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-02-11 | |||
39 | Marko Marin (until 2007-06-30) | 1989-03-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Wesley Sonck (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-08-09 | |||
15 | Kahe (until 2007-08-23) | 1982-08-28 | |||
23 | Nando Rafael (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-01-10 | |||
25 | Moses Lamidi (from 2007-01-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1988-01-05 | |||
25 | Vaclav Sverkos (until 2007-01-09) | 1983-11-01 | |||
26 | Michael Delura (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-07-01 | |||
27 | Oliver Neuville (until 2010-06-30) | 1973-05-01 | |||
41 | Rene Schnitzler (from 2007-05-18) (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-04-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2006-09-10 15:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-10-25 19:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |