Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Norbert Meier (from 2006-09-11) (until 2007-09-24) | 1958-09-20 | ||||
Tom Stohn (from 2006-09-04) (until 2006-09-10) | 1968-12-21 | ||||
Peter Pacult (until 2006-09-03) | 1959-10-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Tom Stohn (from 2006-09-11) (until 2007-09-24) | 1968-12-21 | ||||
Tom Stohn (until 2006-09-03) | 1968-12-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tino Berbig (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-10-07 | |||
23 | Oliver Herber (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-09-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Martin Stocklasa (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-05-29 | |||
3 | Volker Oppitz (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-02-16 | |||
4 | Tomas Votava (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-02-21 | |||
5 | Levente Csik (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-04-29 | |||
6 | Daniel Ernemann (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-02-18 | |||
13 | Jan Koch (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-02-08 | |||
15 | Andre Weiss (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-10-05 | |||
19 | Robert Scannewin (until 2006-12-31) | 1985-10-05 | |||
24 | Paul Schletzke (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-10-02 | |||
25 | Ronald Wolf (until 2008-12-31) | 1987-04-23 | |||
26 | Alen Orman (from 2006-08-31) (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-05-31 | |||
29 | Sebastian Pelzer (from 2006-10-30) (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-09-24 | |||
32 | Cataldo Cozza (from 2007-01-08) (until 2010-07-31) | 1985-04-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Reimund Linkert (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-02-13 | ||||
7 | Markus Knackmuss (until 2008-01-30) | 1974-06-07 | |||
8 | Christian Hauser (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-01-13 | |||
10 | Ivo Ulich (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-09-05 | |||
16 | Michael Kugler (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-09-03 | |||
17 | Alexander Ludwig (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-01-31 | |||
20 | Michael Lerchl (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-08-09 | |||
21 | Rene Beuchel (until 2007-12-31) | 1973-07-31 | |||
22 | Marc Hensel (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-04-17 | |||
27 | Markus Dworrak (from 2006-08-31) (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-01-23 | |||
30 | Stefan Suss (from 2007-01-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-05-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Marco Vorbeck (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-06-24 | |||
11 | Pavel David (until 2008-06-30) | 1978-10-17 | |||
14 | Jan Koziak (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-08-13 | |||
18 | Patrick Wurll (until 2008-06-30) | 1978-08-16 | |||
25 | Andre Heinisch (until 2006-12-31) | 1984-11-03 | |||
33 | Samuel Koejoe (from 2007-01-30) (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-08-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 15:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |