Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Thomas Kohler (until 2008-06-30) | 1967-06-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Petrik Sander (until 2007-09-23) | 1960-11-17 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Thomas Hossmang (until 2007-09-23) | 1966-11-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Gerhard Tremmel (until 2009-06-30) | 1978-11-16 | |||
12 | Andre Thoms (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-12-15 | |||
23 | Tomislav Piplica (until 2009-06-30) | 1969-04-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Sidney (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-10-16 | |||
4 | Kevin McKenna (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-01-21 | |||
6 | Vragel da Silva (until 2010-06-30) | 1974-03-29 | |||
14 | Zoltan Szelesi (until 2007-08-19) | 1981-11-22 | |||
17 | Daniel Ziebig (until 2012-12-31) | 1983-01-21 | |||
18 | Lukasz Kanik (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-02-26 | |||
19 | Benjamin Schockel (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-08-16 | |||
22 | Arne Feick (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-04-01 | |||
24 | Igor Mitreski (until 2009-01-09) | 1979-02-19 | |||
33 | Mario Cvitanovic (from 2007-01-12) (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-05-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Mariusz Kukielka (until 2009-08-26) | 1976-11-07 | |||
7 | Timo Rost (until 2009-12-09) | 1978-08-29 | |||
10 | Stiven Rivic (until 2010-06-30) | 1985-08-09 | |||
11 | Ervin Skela (from 2007-01-05) (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-11-17 | |||
11 | Markus Dworrak (until 2006-08-30) | 1978-01-23 | |||
13 | Sebastian Schuppan (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-07-18 | |||
15 | Lars Jungnickel (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-08-31 | |||
16 | Vlad Munteanu (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-01-16 | |||
20 | Jiayi Shao (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-04-10 | |||
21 | Tomasz Bandrowski (until 2007-12-31) | 1984-09-18 | |||
27 | Daniel Gunkel (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-06-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
2 | Steffen Baumgart (until 2008-01-19) | 1972-01-05 | |||
8 | Lawrence Aidoo (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-01-14 | |||
9 | Francis Kioyo (until 2008-01-23) | 1979-09-18 | |||
25 | Christof Neumann (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-08-02 | |||
29 | Sergiu Radu (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-08-10 | |||
30 | Marco Kuntzel (until 2008-01-01) | 1976-01-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |