Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Norbert Riedel (until 2008-06-30) | 1956-10-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wilko Barre (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-09-10 | ||||
Felix Hoppe (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-05-02 | ||||
Miguel Garcia (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-11-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Adis Muhic (until 2009-06-30) | 1983-03-12 | ||||
Thorsten Rohde (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-03-06 | ||||
Gil Da Rocha (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-02-01 | ||||
Aleksandar Sekulic (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-11-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michel Haskamp (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-01-02 | ||||
Delmar Da Rocha (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-09-28 | ||||
Alperen Kuzu (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-08-02 | ||||
Yusuf Sahin (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-08-30 | ||||
Nehat Shalaj (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-01-25 | ||||
Sven Meinecke (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-02-10 | ||||
Muhamed Hodzic (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-10-19 | ||||
Sedat Korkmaz (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-10-10 | ||||
Furkan Demirbagi (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-04-26 | ||||
Rashid Hasanzadeh Ashrafi (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-07-23 | ||||
Tarek Chaaban (until 2007-01-31) | 1980-03-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Murat Bektas (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-06-15 | ||||
Murat Silgir (from 2007-01-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-08-25 | ||||
Mario Gagelmann (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-10-26 | ||||
Haci Karaca (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-10-02 | ||||
Timo Szybora (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-06-22 | ||||
Patrick Francisco (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-08-29 | ||||
Sebastian Sohl (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-10-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2006-09-10 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |