Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Frank Neubarth (from 2007-04-12) (until 2007-09-17) | 1962-07-29 | ||||
Heiko Weber (until 2007-04-11) | 1965-06-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Marco Kampfe (until 2007-04-11) | 1971-11-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Christian Person (until 2008-01-31) | 1980-12-26 | |||
12 | Daniel Kraus (until 2009-06-30) | 1984-05-11 | |||
25 | Norman Wohlfeld (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-09-25 | |||
35 | Giorgi Lomaia (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-08-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Alexander Voigt (from 2007-01-08) (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-04-13 | |||
3 | Holger Hasse (until 2007-01-06) | 1978-03-15 | |||
4 | Krzysztof Kowalik (until 2007-06-30) | 1971-12-28 | |||
5 | Alexander Maul (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-09-24 | |||
6 | Sven Gunther (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-02-22 | |||
8 | Ralf Schmidt (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-10-09 | |||
15 | Toni Wachsmuth (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-11-15 | |||
18 | Kai Oswald (from 2007-01-11) (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-11-29 | |||
18 | Robert Paul (until 2006-12-31) | 1984-10-17 | |||
22 | Felix Holzner (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-06-04 | |||
26 | Lovre Vulin (from 2006-08-20) (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-09-02 | |||
27 | Ronald Maul (from 2006-10-24) (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-02-13 | |||
28 | Marco Riemer (until 2006-12-31) | 1988-02-24 | |||
32 | Leen van Steensel (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-04-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Ronny Thielemann (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-11-15 | |||
7 | Torsten Ziegner (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-11-09 | |||
9 | Tobias Werner (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-07-19 | |||
13 | Christian Frohlich (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-10-27 | |||
14 | Kevin Schlitte (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-11-04 | |||
16 | Andreas Keil (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-11-10 | |||
21 | Stefan Kuhne (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-08-15 | |||
24 | Kevin Wittke (until 2006-12-31) | 1984-08-17 | |||
36 | Filip Tapalovic (from 2007-01-31) (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-10-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
10 | Sebastian Helbig (until 2008-01-28) | 1977-04-25 | |||
11 | Mark Zimmermann (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-03-01 | |||
17 | Sercan Guvenisik (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-03-01 | |||
19 | Njazi Kuqi (from 2007-01-09) (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-03-25 | |||
19 | Petar Jelic (until 2006-12-31) | 1986-10-18 | |||
20 | Fiete Sykora (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-09-16 | |||
23 | Silvio Pagano (until 2006-12-31) | 1985-09-12 | |||
24 | Patrick De Napoli (until 2007-01-31) | 1975-11-17 | |||
30 | Toni Jurascheck (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-11-06 | |||
31 | Mohammed El Berkani (from 2007-01-16) (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-12-13 | |||
33 | Nils Petersen (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1988-12-06 | |||
34 | Micheil Ashvetia (from 2007-01-24) (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-11-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2006-09-10 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |