Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Klaus-Peter Nemet (until 2011-06-30) | 1953-12-09 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Holger Stanislawski (from 2006-11-21) (until 2011-06-30) | 1969-09-26 | ||||
Andreas Bergmann (until 2006-11-20) | 1959-06-18 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Andre Trulsen (until 2007-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Patrik Borger (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-01-19 | |||
31 | Benedikt Pliquett (until 2010-06-30) | 1984-12-20 | |||
32 | Timo Reus (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-05-02 | |||
33 | Lennart Rotetzki (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-11-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Hempen (until 2006-09-30) | 1974-08-30 | ||||
2 | Florian Lechner (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-03-03 | |||
3 | Ian Joy (until 2008-01-16) | 1981-07-14 | |||
4 | Fabio Morena (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-03-19 | |||
14 | Marcel Eger (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-03-23 | |||
15 | Abdou Sall (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-11-01 | |||
24 | Carsten Rothenbach (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-09-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Hauke Bruckner (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-02-29 | |||
6 | Michel Mazingu-Dinzey (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-10-15 | |||
8 | Florian Bruns (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-08-21 | |||
10 | Thomas Meggle (until 2010-06-30) | 1975-02-22 | |||
12 | Timo Schultz (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-08-26 | |||
13 | Charles Takyi (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-11-12 | |||
17 | Fabian Boll (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-06-16 | |||
18 | Jerry Karikari (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-07-23 | |||
19 | Dirk Prediger (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-01-23 | |||
20 | Jonathan Bourgault (until 2008-06-30) | 1988-09-27 | |||
28 | Lukasz Sosnowski (until 2007-01-16) | 1987-01-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Marvin Braun (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-01-11 | |||
9 | Daniel Stendel (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-04-04 | |||
11 | Jens Scharping (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-07-16 | |||
16 | Roman Prokoph (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-08-06 | |||
22 | Felix Luz (until 2006-12-31) | 1982-01-18 | |||
23 | Ahmet Kuru (from 2007-01-07) (until 2008-07-13) | 1982-04-23 | |||
26 | Morike Sako (from 2007-01-30) (until 2010-06-30) | 1981-11-17 | |||
27 | Jeton Arifi (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-06-02 | |||
36 | Clemens Lange (from 2006-08-31) (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-04-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 20:15 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |