Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Claus Reitmaier (from 2007-02-16) (until 2010-06-30) | 1964-03-17 | ||||
Ronny Teuber (until 2007-01-31) | 1965-09-01 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Huub Stevens (from 2007-02-02) (until 2008-06-30) | 1953-11-29 | ||||
Thomas Doll (until 2007-01-31) | 1966-04-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Markus Schupp (from 2007-02-09) (until 2008-06-30) | 1966-01-07 | ||||
Michael Schroder (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-01-31) | 1959-11-10 | ||||
Ralf Zumdick (until 2007-01-31) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Stefan Wachter (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-04-20 | |||
12 | Sascha Kirschstein (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-06-09 | |||
29 | Wolfgang Hesl (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-01-13 | |||
35 | Frank Rost (from 2007-01-05) (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-06-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Juan Sorin (from 2006-08-30) (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-05-05 | |||
3 | Thimothee Atouba (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-02-17 | |||
4 | Bastian Reinhardt (until 2010-06-30) | 1975-11-19 | |||
5 | Joris Mathijsen (from 2006-08-23) (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-04-05 | |||
8 | Mathias Abel (from 2007-01-31) (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-06-22 | |||
10 | Vincent Kompany (until 2008-08-20) | 1986-04-10 | |||
16 | Rene Klingbeil (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-04-02 | |||
20 | Guy Demel (until 2011-08-30) | 1981-06-13 | |||
21 | Khalid Boulahrouz (until 2006-08-18) | 1981-12-28 | |||
26 | Volker Schmidt (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-09-22 | |||
30 | Collin Benjamin (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-08-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Raphael Wicky (until 2007-08-22) | 1977-04-26 | |||
7 | Mehdi Mahdavikia (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-07-24 | |||
8 | Markus Karl (until 2007-01-29) | 1986-02-14 | |||
13 | Mario Fillinger (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-10-10 | |||
14 | David Jarolim (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-05-17 | |||
15 | Piotr Trochowski (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-03-22 | |||
18 | Oliver Hampel (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-03-02 | |||
23 | Rafael van der Vaart (until 2008-08-03) | 1983-02-11 | |||
27 | Alexander Laas (until 2007-07-22) | 1984-05-05 | |||
28 | Nigel de Jong (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-11-30 | |||
32 | Anis Ben-Hatira (until 2009-01-31) | 1988-07-18 | |||
33 | Benny Feilhaber (until 2007-08-14) | 1985-01-19 | |||
34 | Sidney Sam (until 2008-08-18) | 1988-01-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Paolo Guerrero (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-01 | |||
11 | Ivica Olic (from 2007-01-30) (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-09-14 | |||
11 | Benjamin Lauth (until 2007-01-24) | 1981-08-04 | |||
17 | Boubacar Sanogo (until 2007-07-23) | 1982-12-17 | |||
19 | Mustafa Kucukovic (until 2006-08-08) | 1986-11-05 | |||
22 | Besart Berisha (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-07-29 | |||
37 | Rouwen Hennings (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-08-28 | |||
38 | Danijel Ljuboja (from 2006-08-31) (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-09-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 15:30 |
4 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |