Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Rene Keffel (until 2013-06-30) | 1968-01-14 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Frank (until 2007-10-30) | 1951-02-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Manfred Binz (until 2008-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Cesar Thier (until 2008-06-30) | 1967-10-15 | |||
17 | Daniel Endres (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-05-16 | |||
27 | Ignjac Kresic (until 2007-06-30) | 1966-10-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Lars Weissenfeldt (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-02-15 | |||
3 | Markus Happe (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | |||
4 | Bastian Pinske (until 2008-06-30) | 1978-09-19 | |||
6 | Daniel Schumann (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-02-13 | |||
13 | Heiner Backhaus (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-02-04 | |||
18 | Niko Bungert (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-10-24 | |||
19 | Rudiger Rehm (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-11-22 | |||
24 | Matej Miljatovic (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-06-23 | |||
25 | Steffen Schrod (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-07-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Christian Muller (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-08-13 | |||
8 | Stephan Sieger (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-12-03 | |||
11 | Thorsten Judt (until 2008-06-30) | 1971-06-30 | |||
14 | Thomas Worle (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-02-11 | |||
15 | Alf Mintzel (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-12-21 | |||
16 | Oualid Mokhtari (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-04-29 | |||
20 | Ramazan Yildirim (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-09-07 | |||
21 | Dino Toppmoller (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-11-23 | |||
22 | Christian Pospischil (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-05-14 | |||
23 | Markus Kreuz (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-04-29 | |||
26 | Alexander Karrer (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-03-23 | |||
28 | Alen Basic (from 2007-01-03) (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-09-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Torsten Oehrl (from 2007-01-30) (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-01-07 | |||
7 | Regis Dorn (until 2007-01-29) | 1979-12-22 | |||
9 | Anastasios Agritis (from 2007-01-29) (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-04-16 | |||
9 | Sean Dundee (until 2007-01-28) | 1972-12-07 | |||
10 | Suat Turker (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-03-10 | |||
29 | Marco Reich (from 2007-01-29) (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-12-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 14:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-10-25 19:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-12-20 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2007-02-27 20:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |