Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Zsolt Petry (until 2009-06-30) | 1966-09-23 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Holger Fach (from 2007-01-03) (until 2008-02-08) | 1962-09-06 | ||||
Roland Seitz (from 2006-09-05) (until 2006-12-30) | 1964-10-01 | ||||
Markus Gellhaus (from 2006-08-12) (until 2006-09-04) | 1970-06-09 | ||||
Jos Luhukay (until 2006-08-11) | 1963-06-13 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dariusz Pasieka (from 2006-09-11) (until 2008-04-06) | 1965-08-03 | ||||
Markus Gellhaus (until 2006-08-11) | 1970-06-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lukas Kruse (until 2008-06-30) | 1983-07-09 | |||
31 | Sebastian Lange (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-10-16 | |||
33 | Tom Starke (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-03-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | David Fall (until 2008-06-30) | 1978-02-27 | |||
3 | Lionel Djebi-Zadi (until 2007-01-15) | 1982-05-20 | |||
5 | Dusko Djurisic (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-12-20 | |||
15 | Roel Brouwers (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-11-28 | |||
16 | Thorsten Becker (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-05-13 | |||
21 | Nils Doring (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-04-23 | |||
24 | Marc Gouiffe a Goufan (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-04-12 | |||
25 | Karsten Fischer (from 2007-01-11) (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-05-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Daniel Brinkmann (until 2007-10-31) | 1986-01-29 | |||
6 | Jerome Colinet (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-04-26 | |||
7 | Stephan Maass (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-08-20 | |||
9 | Timo Rottger (until 2008-06-30) | 1985-07-12 | |||
10 | Nebojsa Krupnikovic (from 2007-01-31) (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-08-15 | |||
10 | Fumaca (until 2007-01-28) | 1976-07-15 | |||
12 | Garry De Graef (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-10-21 | |||
17 | Andrew Sinkala (until 2008-06-30) | 1979-06-18 | |||
18 | Markus Krosche (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-09-17 | |||
19 | Mehmet Dragusha (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-10-09 | |||
20 | Huzeyfe Dogan (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-01-01 | |||
22 | Benjamin Schussler (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-05-04 | |||
34 | Ardian Jevric (until 2010-06-30) | 1986-07-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Dennis Schulp (until 2008-01-06) | 1978-01-18 | |||
11 | Rene Muller (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-05-19 | |||
13 | Thomas Broker (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-01-22 | |||
14 | Dion Esajas (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-11-07 | |||
23 | Yilmaz Ortulu (until 2007-01-15) | 1980-03-30 | |||
28 | Erwin Koen (from 2006-09-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1978-09-07 | |||
35 | Serdar Bayrak (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-08-29) | 1985-08-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 14:00 |
6 : 7 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-10-25 19:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |