Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Michael Feichtenbeiner (until 2008-04-24) | 1960-07-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ohannes Yardim (until 2008-06-30) | 1963-10-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Ralf Hermanutz (until 2011-06-30) | 1970-07-07 | |||
22 | Florian Schurenberg (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-09-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Marcel Busch (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-02-02 | |||
5 | Marcel Rapp (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-04-16 | |||
10 | Helgi Kolvidsson (until 2008-06-30) | 1971-09-13 | |||
12 | Matthias Kiefer (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-02-01 | |||
15 | Marco Konrad (until 2010-06-30) | 1974-10-18 | |||
21 | Marc Lerandy (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-11-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Christian Mehr (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-04-28 | |||
3 | Leandro Grech (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-10-14 | |||
6 | Christian Deufel (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-10-10 | |||
7 | Andreas Schumacher (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-06-02 | |||
8 | Mark Zeh (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-11-19 | |||
13 | Johannes Flum (until 2008-06-30) | 1987-12-14 | |||
14 | Patrick Hagg (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-02-12 | |||
17 | Fabian Gerster (until 2009-06-30) | 1986-12-29 | |||
19 | Ralf Zimmermann (until 2008-06-30) | 1981-01-07 | |||
20 | Rodrigo Martins (from 2007-01-20) (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-10-05 | |||
27 | David Lauretta (until 2006-12-31) | 1983-09-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Bulent Alkan | 1979 | ||||
11 | Sebastian Heidinger (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-01-11 | |||
16 | Neno Rogosic (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-09-02 | |||
21 | Samir Karahasanovic (until 2006-07-31) | 1982-11-02 | |||
23 | Toni Fiore (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-04-09 | |||
24 | Ivica Lucic (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-01-19 | |||
28 | Eric Agyemang (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-01-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2006-09-10 17:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2006-10-25 19:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |