Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Uwe Zimmermann (from 2007-03-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1962-02-11 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Loose (until 2007-09-28) | 1963-01-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Sascha Franz (until 2007-09-30) | 1974-01-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thomas Richter (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-08-19 | |||
21 | Christian Berchthold (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-05-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Bjorn Weikl (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-02-09 | |||
3 | Tobias Nickenig (from 2007-01-30) (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-08-01 | |||
4 | Nassim Banouas (from 2006-08-29) (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-09-08 | |||
5 | Marco Stark (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-07-09 | |||
6 | Stefan Binder (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-10-12 | |||
14 | Marco Laaser (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-01-16 | |||
15 | Zdenek Kroca (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-09-29 | |||
16 | Cem Islamoglu (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-09-04 | |||
19 | Yann Schneider (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-01-19 | |||
21 | Tobias Wurm (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-03-31 | |||
23 | Daniel Bogusz (until 2011-06-30) | 1974-09-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Robert Vujevic (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-11-26 | |||
10 | Peter Nemeth (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-09-14 | |||
11 | Denis Berger (until 2007-01-20) | 1983-04-14 | |||
12 | Gaetan Krebs (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-11-18 | |||
18 | Andreas Nauroth (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-02-26 | |||
20 | Enrico Gaede (from 2007-01-09) (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-01-31 | |||
22 | Nils Pfingsten-Reddig (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-05-23 | |||
25 | David Ulm (from 2007-01-30) (until 2008-01-31) | 1984-06-30 | |||
32 | Henrik Blecker (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-02-06 | |||
33 | Patrick Dama (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-04-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Youssef Sofiane (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-07-08 | ||||
7 | Husni Tahiri (until 2010-06-30) | 1983-06-02 | |||
7 | Najeh Braham (from 2006-08-17) (until 2007-12-31) | 1977-05-20 | |||
13 | Alexander Blessin (from 2006-08-18) (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-05-28 | |||
17 | Till Bettenstaedt (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-01-20 | |||
20 | Marcel Heller (until 2006-12-31) | 1986-02-12 | |||
30 | Christian Okpala (from 2007-01-16) (until 2008-08-27) | 1976-11-20 | |||
39 | Omer Sonmez (until 2007-06-30) | 1986-05-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |