Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Norbert Schlegel (until 2007-06-30) | 1961-03-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Alexander Hofmann (until 2010-06-30) | 1976-01-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Hassler (until 2008-06-30) | 1986-04-14 | |||
33 | Florian Schmidt (until 2008-06-30) | 1977-12-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Toni Lempke (from 2006-08-29) (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-10-19 | ||||
Jochen Kauper (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-01-13 | ||||
Sandi Pavlovic (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-02-12 | ||||
3 | Marcel Mayr (until 2008-12-31) | 1977-05-11 | |||
5 | Julian Matiasovits (until 2006-10-09) | 1983-11-15 | |||
7 | Florian Wurster (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-08-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Soner Calisir (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-06-30 | ||||
Michael Steinemann (from 2006-08-30) (until 2007-06-30) | 1984-03-15 | ||||
Alexander Hofmann (until 2006-12-31) | 1976-01-09 | ||||
2 | Benjamin Demel (until 2008-12-31) | 1981-01-01 | |||
5 | Roy Stapelfeld (until 2009-06-30) | 1976-04-03 | |||
6 | Stefan Seufert (until 2008-12-31) | 1979-05-10 | |||
10 | Ante Sicenica (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-04-05 | |||
13 | Markus Goller (until 2009-06-30) | 1980-02-19 | |||
18 | Giorgio Arancino (until 2007-03-15) | 1980-04-10 | |||
21 | Matthias Heckenberger (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-11-09 | |||
36 | Ingo Walther (until 2007-06-30) | 1969-11-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Nino Rauch (from 2007-01-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1987-08-20 | ||||
Sascha Gobel (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-09-17 | ||||
9 | Hrvoje Vlaovic (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-07-09 | |||
11 | Markus Fuchs (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-02-24 | |||
23 | Alexander Kossmann (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-06-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2006-09-09 14:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |